Iron Workers District Council of Southern Ohio & Vicinity Benefit Trust et al v. Trans World Construction Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Iron Workers District Council of Southern Ohio & Vicinity Benefit Trust, Iron Workers District Council Of Southern Ohio & Vicinity Annuity Trust and Iron Workers District Council of Southern Ohio & Vicinity Pension Trust
Defendant: Erin Ritchey, Trans World Construction Services, Inc. and Nick Ritchey
Case Number: 3:2018cv00317
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Walter H Rice
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Filing 14 Application to Clerk for entry of default against Trans World Construction Services, Inc., Erin Ritchey and Nick Ritchey (Attachments: #1 Affidavit David M. Pixley) (Pixley, David)
November 19, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Nick Ritchey. (Pixley, David)
November 19, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Erin Ritchey. (Pixley, David)
November 19, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Trans World Construction Services, Inc.. (Pixley, David)
November 2, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Erin Ritchey. Erin Ritchey served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. (Hoffman, Joseph)
November 2, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Nick Ritchey. Nick Ritchey served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. (Hoffman, Joseph)
November 2, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Trans World Construction Services, Inc.. Trans World Construction Services, Inc. served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. (Hoffman, Joseph)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER sustaining- re #6 Request for Issuance of Summons filed by Iron Workers District Council Of Southern Ohio & Vicinity Annuity Trust, Iron Workers District Council of Southern Ohio & Vicinity Benefit Trust, Iron Workers District Council of Southern Ohio & Vicinity Pension Trust. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 10/15/2018. (tp)
October 11, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Trans World Construction Services, Inc., Erin Ritchey, Nick Ritchey. (srb)
October 10, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form TWC, #2 Summons Form Erin Ritchey, #3 Summons Form Nick Ritchey) (Hoffman, Joseph)
October 4, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Money Damages, Injunctive Relief, and Attorneys' Fees for Violations of ERISA against All Defendants, filed by Iron Workers District Council of Southern Ohio & Vicinity Benefit Trust, Iron Workers District Council Of Southern Ohio & Vicinity Annuity Trust, Iron Workers District Council of Southern Ohio & Vicinity Pension Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Benefit Trust Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 Pension Trust Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 Annuity Trust Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4 Participation Agreement, #5 Summons Form TWC, #6 Summons Form E Ritchey, #7 Summons Form N Ritchey) (Hoffman, Joseph)
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Erin Ritchey and Trans World Construction Services, Inc. (jmb)
September 24, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form Trans World Construction Services Inc., #2 Summons Form Erin Ritchey) (Hoffman, Joseph)
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Iron Workers District Council Of Southern Ohio & Vicinity Annuity Trust, Iron Workers District Council of Southern Ohio & Vicinity Benefit Trust, Iron Workers District Council of Southern Ohio & Vicinity Pension Trust re #1 Complaint, (Hoffman, Joseph)
September 24, 2018 Notice of Correction re: #1 Complaint- Pursuant to S.D. Ohio Civ. R. 3.1, every complaint or other document initiating a civil action must be accompanied by a completed civil cover sheet on a form available from the Clerk and on the Court's website at http://www.ohsd.uscourts.gov/ohio-southern-district-forms. Please file a civil cover sheet using the event Civil-Other Filings-Notices-Notice(Other) and link the document back to the complaint. (kma)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Erin Ritchey, Trans World Construction Services, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6610294), filed by Iron Workers District Council of Southern Ohio & Vicinity Benefit Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Benefit Trust, #2 Exhibit Pension Trust, #3 Exhibit Annuity Trust, #4 Exhibit Participation Agreement) (Hoffman, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iron Workers District Council of Southern Ohio & Vicinity Benefit Trust et al v. Trans World Construction Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iron Workers District Council of Southern Ohio & Vicinity Benefit Trust
Represented By: Joseph C Hoffman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iron Workers District Council Of Southern Ohio & Vicinity Annuity Trust
Represented By: Joseph C Hoffman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iron Workers District Council of Southern Ohio & Vicinity Pension Trust
Represented By: Joseph C Hoffman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Ritchey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans World Construction Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Ritchey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?