City of Dayton v. 3M Company et al

Plaintiff: City of Dayton
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, National Foam, Inc., 3M Company, Tyco Fire Products LP and Chemguard, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00331
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Walter H Rice
2 Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP, Johnson Controls International plc identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc for Chemguard, Inc... (Ireland, Donald)
November 2, 2018 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP, Johnson Controls International plc identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc for Tyco Fire Products LP.. (Ireland, Donald)
November 2, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Rhinehart for Defendants Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP (Rhinehart, Erin)
November 2, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald Jeffrey Ireland for Defendants Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP (Ireland, Donald)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #10 Dfts' Unopposed Joint Motion for Extension of Time until 12/20/2018 to Respond to Complaint. If Dfts' move to dismiss, Plt's may have until 1/25/2019 to respond to that motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 10/30/2018. (sln)
October 30, 2018 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, New date requested 12/20/2018. by Defendants 3M Company, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Chemguard, Inc., National Foam, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Corwin, Jonathan)
October 22, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants 3M Company, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Chemguard, Inc., National Foam, Inc., and Tyco Fire Products LP. 3M Company served on 10/18/2018, answer due 11/8/2018; Buckeye Fire Equipment Company served on 10/18/2018, answer due 11/8/2018; Chemguard, Inc. served on 10/18/2018, answer due 11/8/2018; National Foam, Inc. served on 10/17/2018, answer due 11/7/2018; Tyco Fire Products LP served on 10/17/2018, answer due 11/7/2018. (jmb)
October 15, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk: Certified mail service has been done by the Clerk, U.S. District Court on October 15, 2018. A copy of the complaint, document 1, and summons, document 3, was sent by certified mail to the following locations: CT Corporation System for National Foam, Inc., 4400 EastonCommons Way, Suite 125, Columbus, OH 43219 Article Number (91 7199 9991 70304994 8691) Chemguard, One Stanton St., Marinette, WI, 54143, Article Number(91 7199 9991 7030 4994 8905) Tyco Fire Products, c/o Statutory Agent CT Corporation System, 4400 Easton Commons Way, Suite 125, Columbus, OH 43219, Article Number (91 7199 9991 7030 4994 8684) Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, 110 Kings Rd., Kings Mountain, NC 28086, ArticleNumber (91 7199 9991 7030 4994 8912)3M Company, c/o Statutory Agent Corporation Service Company, 2345 Rice St., Suite 230, Roseville, MN, 55113, Article Number ( 91 7199 9991 7030 4994 8929). (kma)
October 15, 2018 Termination of Answer due date. (jlk)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - The Court STRIKES Plaintiffs summons returns 5 & #6 for noncompliance with the Local Rules. The deadline to respond to the Complaint is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on October 15, 2018. (jlk)
October 12, 2018 Filing 6 STRICKEN PER ORDER #7 ***SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants 3M Company, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Chemguard, Inc., National Foam, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt Return 3M, #2 Certified Mail Receipt Return Buckeye, #3 Certified Mail Receipt Return Chemguard, #4 Certified Mail Receipt Return National Foam, #5 Certified Mail Receipt Return Tyco) (Tismo, J) Modified text on 10/15/2018 (jlk).
October 12, 2018 NOTICE re 5 Summons Returned Executed: Document was filed incorrectly by counsel without service and answer dates reflected in the docket text. Counsel is to refile document with service dates and answer dates reflected in docket text. (kma)
October 12, 2018 Notice of Correction re: 4 Certificate of Service: Case Administrator restricted document because it was filed in error by counsel. Document has been regenerated to notify counsel of change. (kma)
October 9, 2018 Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers added. Judge Walter H. Rice no longer assigned to case (per the directions of Chief Judge Sargus' chambers and its relation to MDL 2433, this case was directly reassigned to Chief Judge Sargus and Magistrate Judge Deavers). (sem)
October 4, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to 3M Company, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Chemguard, Inc., National Foam, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (kma)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney Paul J. Napoli, Patrick J. Lancotti, Tate J. Kunkle, and Louise R. Caro. (kma)
October 4, 2018 NOTICE re #1 Complaint: There are additional Plaintiff's counsel listed on supplemental civil cover sheet. Additional counsel must enter a Notice of Appearance to receive notices on the case. (kma)
October 4, 2018 Notice: If case is to be referred it will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman. (kma)
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6624701), filed by City of Dayton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Form) (Tismo, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Dayton v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Jonathan P Corwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Represented By: Erin Rhinehart
Represented By: Donald Jeffrey Ireland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard, Inc.
Represented By: Erin Rhinehart
Represented By: Donald Jeffrey Ireland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Dayton
Represented By: J Pierre Tismo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?