Akbar v. Khai, et al
Plaintiff: Chassidy Akbar
Defendant: Zam Chin Khai, Ohio Department of Medicaid and Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00339
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael J Newman
Referring Judge: Walter H Rice
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by Plaintiff Chassidy Akbar Notice of Consent to the United States Magistrate Judge (Gresham, Robert)
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE by Defendant Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC of Nonconsent to the Jurisdiction of the United States Magistrate Judge (Pokrywka, Brian)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Case is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman - Motions directed to pleadings due by 12/31/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 12/31/2018. Lay Witness due by 12/30/2018. Plaintiff Primary Expert due by 1/15/2019. Plaintiff Rebuttal Expert due by 3/15/2019. Defendant Primary Expert due by 2/28/2019. Defendant Rebuttal Expert due by 3/15/2019. Discovery due by 6/3/2019. Status Conference set for 6/10/2019 05:00 PM in Teleconference before Judge Walter H. Rice. Proposed Final Pretrial Order due by 10/15/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/22/2019 05:00 PM in Teleconference before Judge Walter H. Rice. Exhibit Submission for Trial or Hearing due by 10/18/2019. Jury Trial set for 11/4/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Dayton before Judge Walter H. Rice. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 11/19/18. (cib)
November 20, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Trial set for 11/4/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Dayton before Judge Walter H. Rice. (tp)
November 19, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Walter H. Rice: Telephone Conference held on 11/19/2018 (trial set for 11/4/2019). Scheduling Order to be filed shortly. (djv)
November 12, 2018 Filing 5 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF THE PARTIES by Plaintiff Chassidy Akbar. (Gresham, Robert)
October 23, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC. (Pokrywka, Brian)
October 16, 2018 If case is referred it will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman. (jmb)
October 16, 2018 Filing 3 (Copy of) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Zam Chin Khai, Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC, and the Ohio Department of Medicaid, filed by Chassidy Akbar. (Originally filed in the Common Pleas Court of Montgomery County, Ohio, Case No. 2018 CV 4352 on September 19, 2018). (jmb)
October 16, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC. (Pokrywka, Brian)
October 16, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montgomery County Court of Common Pleas, case number 18 CV 04352 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6639962), filed by Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC, Zam Chin Khai. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A- Complaint, #4 Exhibit B- State Court Docket and Pleadings, #5 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal) (Pokrywka, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Akbar v. Khai, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chassidy Akbar
Represented By: Michael L Wright
Represented By: Loukesha Q Brooks
Represented By: Robert Leroy Gresham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zam Chin Khai
Represented By: Brian J. Pokrywka
Represented By: Douglas William Rennie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Department of Medicaid
Represented By: Robert Joseph Byrne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC
Represented By: Brian J. Pokrywka
Represented By: Douglas William Rennie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?