United States of America v. One Hundred Ninety-One Thousand, One Hundred Thirty-Five Dollars in United States Currency ($191,135.00) et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Eight Hundred Eleven Dollars in United States Currency ($811.00), One 2015 KTM 85 Moto Cross, VIN VBKMXC235FM011064, with all attachments thereto, One 2016 Dodge Charger, VIN 2C3CDXHG6GH214657, with all attachments thereto, Contents of MainSource Bank, Division of First Financial Bank, Account Number xx9510 in the name of Busch's Country Corner, Inc. or Cheryl Busch or Amanda Busch, Contents of MainSourceBank, Division of First Financial Bank, Account Number xx7566 in the name of Amanda Busch, Contents of MainSource Bank, Division of First Financial Bank, Account Number xx9405 in the name of Amanda Busch or Mike Busch, One 2014 Mazda 3, VIN JM1BM1U79E1167923, with all attachments thereto, One 2012 Nissan Murano, VIN JN8AZ1MW4CW210167, with all attachments thereon, One 2013 GMC Denali, VIN 1GT125E81DF179761, with all attachments thereon and One Hundred Ninety-One Thousand, One Hundred Thirty-Five Dollars in United States Currency ($191,135.00)
Claimant: Amanda Busch, Busch's Country Corner, Inc., Christina Busch and Michael Busch
Case Number: 3:2018cv00366
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Walter H Rice
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 NOTICE OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: Telephone Conference set for 1/15/2019 04:00 PM before Judge Walter H. Rice. The Court will initiate the call. If you wish a number called other than what is listed on the docket, please notify the Court. (tp)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 Christina Busch's Verified CLAIM of Interest in Property Subject to Forfeiture by Claimant Christina Busch. (kma)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Return of Property by Claimant Busch's Country Corner, Inc.. (Dusing, Benjamin)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Return of Property by Claimant Michael Busch. (Dusing, Benjamin)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Return of Property by Claimant Amanda Busch. (Dusing, Benjamin)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Augustus B. Flottman for Defendants Contents of MainSource Bank, Division of First Financial Bank, Account Number xx9405 in the name of Amanda Busch or Mike Busch, Contents of MainSource Bank, Division of First Financial Bank, Account Number xx9510 in the name of Busch's Country Corner, Inc. or Cheryl Busch or Amanda Busch, Contents of MainSourceBank, Division of First Financial Bank, Account Number xx7566 in the name of Amanda Busch, Eight Hundred Eleven Dollars in United States Currency ($811.00), One 2012 Nissan Murano, VIN JN8AZ1MW4CW210167, with all attachments thereon, One 2013 GMC Denali, VIN 1GT125E81DF179761, with all attachments thereon, One 2014 Mazda 3, VIN JM1BM1U79E1167923, with all attachments thereto, One 2015 KTM 85 Moto Cross, VIN VBKMXC235FM011064, with all attachments thereto, One 2016 Dodge Charger, VIN 2C3CDXHG6GH214657, with all attachments thereto, One Hundred Ninety-One Thousand, One Hundred Thirty-Five Dollars in United States Currency ($191,135.00) (Flottman, Augustus)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin G Dusing for Defendants Contents of MainSource Bank, Division of First Financial Bank, Account Number xx9405 in the name of Amanda Busch or Mike Busch, Contents of MainSource Bank, Division of First Financial Bank, Account Number xx9510 in the name of Busch's Country Corner, Inc. or Cheryl Busch or Amanda Busch, Contents of MainSourceBank, Division of First Financial Bank, Account Number xx7566 in the name of Amanda Busch, Eight Hundred Eleven Dollars in United States Currency ($811.00), One 2012 Nissan Murano, VIN JN8AZ1MW4CW210167, with all attachments thereon, One 2013 GMC Denali, VIN 1GT125E81DF179761, with all attachments thereon, One 2014 Mazda 3, VIN JM1BM1U79E1167923, with all attachments thereto, One 2015 KTM 85 Moto Cross, VIN VBKMXC235FM011064, with all attachments thereto, One 2016 Dodge Charger, VIN 2C3CDXHG6GH214657, with all attachments thereto, One Hundred Ninety-One Thousand, One Hundred Thirty-Five Dollars in United States Currency ($191,135.00) (Dusing, Benjamin)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER FOR WARRANT IN REM. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 11/8/18. (kma)
November 7, 2018 If case is referred it will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington. (jmb)
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Contents of MainSource Bank, Division of First Financial Bank, Account Number xx9405 in the name of Amanda Busch or Mike Busch, Contents of MainSource Bank, Division of First Financial Bank, Account Number xx9510 in the name of Busch's Country Corner, Inc. or Cheryl Busch or Amanda Busch, Contents of MainSourceBank, Division of First Financial Bank, Account Number xx7566 in the name of Amanda Busch, Eight Hundred Eleven Dollars in United States Currency ($811.00), One 2012 Nissan Murano, VIN JN8AZ1MW4CW210167, with all attachments thereon, One 2013 GMC Denali, VIN 1GT125E81DF179761, with all attachments thereon, One 2014 Mazda 3, VIN JM1BM1U79E1167923, with all attachments thereto, One 2015 KTM 85 Moto Cross, VIN VBKMXC235FM011064, with all attachments thereto, One 2016 Dodge Charger, VIN 2C3CDXHG6GH214657, with all attachments thereto, One Hundred Ninety-One Thousand, One Hundred Thirty-Five Dollars in United States Currency ($191,135.00). (jmb)
November 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Form $191,135.00 in US Currency, #4 Summons Form $811.00 in US Currency, #5 Summons Form MainSource Bank Acct. No xx9510, #6 Summons Form MainSource Acct. No xx7566, #7 Summons Form MainSource Acct. No xx9405, #8 Summons Form 2016 Dodge Charger, #9 Summons Form 2015 KTM Moto Cross, #10 Summons Form 2014 Mazda 3, #11 Summons Form 2013 GMC Denali, #12 Summons Form 2012 Nissan Murano) (Grimes, Deborah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. One Hundred Ninety-One Thousand, One Hundred Thirty-Five Dollars in United States Currency ($191,135.00) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eight Hundred Eleven Dollars in United States Currency ($811.00)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 2015 KTM 85 Moto Cross, VIN VBKMXC235FM011064, with all attachments thereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 2016 Dodge Charger, VIN 2C3CDXHG6GH214657, with all attachments thereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contents of MainSource Bank, Division of First Financial Bank, Account Number xx9510 in the name of Busch's Country Corner, Inc. or Cheryl Busch or Amanda Busch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contents of MainSourceBank, Division of First Financial Bank, Account Number xx7566 in the name of Amanda Busch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contents of MainSource Bank, Division of First Financial Bank, Account Number xx9405 in the name of Amanda Busch or Mike Busch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 2014 Mazda 3, VIN JM1BM1U79E1167923, with all attachments thereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 2012 Nissan Murano, VIN JN8AZ1MW4CW210167, with all attachments thereon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 2013 GMC Denali, VIN 1GT125E81DF179761, with all attachments thereon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Hundred Ninety-One Thousand, One Hundred Thirty-Five Dollars in United States Currency ($191,135.00)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Deborah Diane Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Amanda Busch
Represented By: Benjamin G Dusing
Represented By: Augustus B. Flottman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Busch's Country Corner, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin G Dusing
Represented By: Augustus B. Flottman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Christina Busch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Michael Busch
Represented By: Benjamin G Dusing
Represented By: Augustus B. Flottman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?