myCUmortgage, LLC v. Davis et al

Plaintiff: myCUmortgage, LLC
Defendant: Wilford L Davis, Wright Patt Credit Union, Inc, Montgomery County Treasurer and Jane Doe
Case Number: 3:2019cv00022
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Ovington
Referring Judge: Walter H Rice
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 Objection to Defendant's Petition for Removal by Plaintiff myCUmortgage, LLC. (Niklas, Christian)
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 (Copy of) ANSWER to #4 Complaint, filed by Montgomery County Treasurer. (Originally filed in the Montgomery County Common Pleas Court on July 18, 2016, Case No. 2016 CV 03339). (jmb)
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 (Copy of) COMPLAINT against Wilford L. Davis; Jane Doe, Unknown Spouse if any of Wilford L. Davis; Montgomery County Treasurer; and Wright Patt Credit Union, Inc. filed by myCUmortgage, LLC. (Originally filed in Montgomery County Common Pleas Court on June 30, 2016, Case No. 2016 CV 03339). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E) (jmb)
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montgomery County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2016 CV 03339, filed by Wilford L Davis. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Attachments, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (jmb)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #1 Defendant Wilford L. Davis's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is instructed to separately docket Defendant Davis's Notice of Removal and serve, by U.S. mail, a copy of Defendant Davis's Notice of Removal and attached Exhibits, and a copy of this Notation Order, upon Plaintiff myUCmortgage, LLC at 425 Phillips Boulevard, Ewing, NJ 08618. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 1/29/19. (mcm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney Kim M. Hammond. (kma)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The Office of the Clerk is in possession of all necessary service documents) by Defendant Wilford L Davis. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Attachments to Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Complaint) (pb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: myCUmortgage, LLC v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilford L Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Patt Credit Union, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery County Treasurer
Represented By: Lynne R. Nothstine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: myCUmortgage, LLC
Represented By: Christian Eric Niklas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?