Bishop v. Montgomery Lynch & Associates, Inc.

Plaintiff: Amber Bishop
Defendant: Montgomery Lynch & Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00063
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk: A copy of the complaint and issued summons was sent to the named defendant via certified mail. (er)
April 22, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Montgomery Lynch & Associates, Inc.. (kma)
April 19, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form) (Hilton, Jonathan)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by the Clerk: A Copy of the Complaint and Issued Summons were mailed to the named defendant via certified mail. (daf)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Montgomery Lynch & Associates, Inc.. (kma)
March 4, 2019 Notice: If case is to be referred it will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington. (kma)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Montgomery Lynch & Associates, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6818668), filed by Amber Bishop. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form for Montgomery Lynch & Associates, Inc.) (Hilton, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bishop v. Montgomery Lynch & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery Lynch & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Bishop
Represented By: Jonathan Lawrence Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?