Morrison v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Brandon Morrison
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 3:2019cv00102
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Ovington
Referring Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 First CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by Defendant Statement of Errors due by 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 court trasncript index, #2 documents related to administrative record, #3 payment documents and decisions, #4 jurisdictional documents and notice, #5 non disability related development, #6 disability related development, #7 medical records part 1, #8 medical records part 2, #9 medical records part 3) (Stark, John)
April 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Commissioner of Social Security served on 4/17/2019, answer due 6/17/2019. (Rake, Michael)
April 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Shefali Baltz for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Baltz, Shefali) Modified attorney role on 4/22/2019 (rp).
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (srb)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Brandon Morrison. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form, #3 Summons Form, #4 Summons Form, #5 Summons Form) (Rake, Michael)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 4/8/19. (SLO)
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Brandon Morrison. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Summons Form, #4 Summons Form, #5 Summons Form, #6 Summons Form) (Rake, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morrison v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Represented By: Shefali Baltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Morrison
Represented By: Michael A Rake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?