In re: Ralph Louis and Lisa A. Citro
Plaintiff: Donald F Harker, III and Chapter 7 Trustee in Bankruptcy
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service and AAG Ohio Department of Taxation
In Re: Lisa A. Citro and Ralph Louis Citro
Interested Party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court
Case Number: 3:2019cv00139
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by James Shafor Harding for Creditor Ohio Department of Taxation (Harding, James)
June 4, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 6/18/2019 Replies due by 7/2/2019. (de)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER - re #2 Motion to Withdraw Reference - Responses in opposition to the motion, if any, must be filed on or before June 18, 2019. Replies in support of the motion, if any, must be filed on or before July 2, 2019. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 6-4-2019. (de)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Withdraw Reference by Defendant Internal Revenue Service. (er)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of WITHDRAWAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 3:18-ap-03008. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appeal Transmittal Cover Sheet) (er)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Ralph Louis and Lisa A. Citro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Mary A. Stallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AAG Ohio Department of Taxation
Represented By: James Shafor Harding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Lisa A. Citro
Represented By: Roger Essell Luring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Ralph Louis Citro
Represented By: Roger Essell Luring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald F Harker, III
Represented By: Patricia Friesinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chapter 7 Trustee in Bankruptcy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court
Represented By: U.S. Bankruptcy Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?