Siler v. Sinclair Community College et al

Plaintiff: Janice Siler
Defendant: Sinclair Community College and Elizabeth Orlando
Case Number: 3:2019cv00150
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Walter H Rice
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Elizabeth Orlando on 5/20/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (Mezibov, Marc)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Sinclair Community College on 5/20/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (Mezibov, Marc)
May 21, 2019 Notice: If case is to be referred it will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman. (kma)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Elizabeth Orlando, Sinclair Community College ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6932219), filed by Janice Siler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue) (Mezibov, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Siler v. Sinclair Community College et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Siler
Represented By: Marc David Mezibov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sinclair Community College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Orlando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?