Neal v. United of Omaha Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Janet Neal
Defendant: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company and United Dairy Farmers, Inc., Administrator
Case Number: 3:2019cv00193
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRLIMINARY PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Production of Administrative Record due August 30, 2019; Administrative Record to be filed by September 30, 2019; Motions for Judgment on the administrative record: Plaintiff: November 1, 2019Defendant: November 22, 2019 and Responses: Plaintiff: December 6, 2019 Defendant: December 20, 2019. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 8/16/19. (ep)
August 15, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas M. Rose: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/15/2019. Scheduling Order to issue. (ep)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Janet Neal (Smalley, John)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 26(f) REPORT of the Parties by Plaintiff Janet Neal. (Smalley, John)
July 2, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for Thursday, August 15, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. by telephone conference call before Judge Thomas M. Rose. The Court will initiate the call. Prior to the pretrial conference counsel must comply with the MANDATORY DISCLOSURE RULES of Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a)(1) and the MANDATORY, pre-preliminary pretrial conference between counsel, required by Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(f). NOTE: the format for the Rule 26(f) conference between counsel and the report to the Court has been altered. This new form is available on line and MUST be utilized in this case. THE REPORT MUST BE FILED 7 DAYS PRIOR TO THE PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. In all cases with class action allegations, the parties shall include in their Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) report proposed deadlines for completing discovery relevant to those allegations and for filing a motion to certify a class, and a proposed date for class action determination. Pretrial procedures and forms can be found at our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov. Should more attorneys be actively involved than those listed on the Courts docket, please notify the courtroom deputy, Liz Penski, at 937-512-1603, immediately, to include the additional attorneys in the Preliminary Pretrial Conference. Only phone numbers for direct lines (not answering systems) should be provided to the Court. If you wish a direct line number other than your office number called, please advise the Court at least 24 hours preceding the conference. (ep)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, filed by All Defendants. (Brenner, Todd)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Defendant United of Omaha Life Insurance Company re #2 Complaint, Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet (Brenner, Todd)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 (Copy of)COMPLAINT against United Dairy Farmers, Inc., Administrator, United of Omaha Life Insurance Company, originally filed in Montgomery County Common Pleas Court, on June 5, 2019, under case number 2019 CV 02596.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (kma)
June 25, 2019 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal: Pursuant to S.D. Ohio Civ. R. 3.1 every complaint or other document initiating a civil action must be accompanied by a completed civil cover sheet on a form available from the Clerk and on the Courts website at http://www.ohsd.uscourts.gov/ohio-southern-district-forms. Please file a supplemental civil cover sheet, required for notice of removal cases, using the event Civil-Other Filings-Notices-Notice (Other) and link the document back to the complaint. (kma)
June 25, 2019 Notice: If case is to be referred it will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington. (kma)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montgomery County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019 CV 2596 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6979396), filed by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit : Complaint and Exhbits filed in state court) (Brenner, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neal v. United of Omaha Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Neal
Represented By: John Allan Smalley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Todd A Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Dairy Farmers, Inc., Administrator
Represented By: Todd A Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?