Morrison v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Tammy A. Morrison
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2019cv00194
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Ovington
Referring Judge: Walter H Rice
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of a final judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 7/15/2019. (srb)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 JOINT CONSENT OF THE PARTIES TO PROCEED BEFORE THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE . (Kellup, Kiywhanna)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kiywhanna LaChic Kellup for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Kellup, Kiywhanna) Modified Attorney role on 7/11/2019 - Atty to be noticed - Atty is co-counsel, not lead (rp).
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Commissioner of Social Security served on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Dobson, Stephanie)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (srb)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Tammy A. Morrison. (srb)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 6/25/19. (SLO)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Tammy A. Morrison. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Form, #4 Summons Form, #5 Summons Form, #6 Summons Form) (Dobson, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morrison v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy A. Morrison
Represented By: Stephanie D Dobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Represented By: Kiywhanna LaChic Kellup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?