Adkins v. Premier Estates 520, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Catrina Adkins
Defendant: Trillium Healthcare Consulting, LLC and Premier Estates 520, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00203
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Trillium Healthcare Consulting, LLC. (Gelhaus, Emily)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Premier Estates 520, LLC. (Gelhaus, Emily)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by All Defendants. (Gelhaus, Emily)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Trillium Healthcare Consulting, LLC on 7/9/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Gibson, Bradley)
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Premier Estates 520, LLC on 7/9/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Gibson, Bradley)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Greivenkamp for Plaintiff Catrina Adkins (Greivenkamp, Brian)
July 11, 2019 Notice: If case is to be referred it will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman. (kma)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7001159), filed by Catrina Adkins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A Notice of Dismissal and Right to Sue) (Gibson, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adkins v. Premier Estates 520, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trillium Healthcare Consulting, LLC
Represented By: Emily J Gelhaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Estates 520, LLC
Represented By: Emily J Gelhaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catrina Adkins
Represented By: Bradley Lawrence Gibson
Represented By: Brian Greivenkamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?