Stowe v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Jennifer Stowe
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 3:2019cv00209
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael J Newman
Referring Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Commissioner of Social Security served on 7/24/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Rake, Michael)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of a final judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 08/01/2019. (jmb)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 JOINT CONSENT OF THE PARTIES TO PROCEED BEFORE THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE . (Ochoa, Susana)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - This Social Security disability appeal is before the Court on Plaintiffs complaint. On appeal before this Court, the parties are ORDERED to meet and confer within seven (7) days from the entry of this Order to determine among counsel and the parties only whether consent to the undersigned is unanimous and, if so, to file the appropriate consent form which can be found at http://www.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/ao085.pdf (also attached hereto). Consent is voluntary and any party may withhold consent for any reason without adverse consequence. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 7/31/2019. (dm)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Susana Ochoa for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Ochoa, Susana)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (pb)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Jennifer Stowe. (pb)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER GRANTING #1 PLAINTIFF'S Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 7/22/2019. (dm)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jennifer Stowe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Summons Form, #4 Summons Form, #5 Summons Form, #6 Summons Form) (Rake, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stowe v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Represented By: Susana Ochoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Stowe
Represented By: Michael A Rake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?