Williams v. Wright-Patt Credit Union
Plaintiff: Travis Lanier Williams
Defendant: Wright-Patt Credit Union
Case Number: 3:2019cv00233
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael J Newman
Referring Judge: Walter H Rice
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 31:3545
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed on 9/23/2019. (srb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 DECISION AND ENTRY ADOPTING UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (DOC. #4 ); OVERRULING PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS THERETO (DOC. #5 ); DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO REFILING IN A STATE COURT OF COMPETENT JURISDICTION; JUDGMENT TO ENTER IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT AND AGAINST PLAINTIFF; TERMINATION ENTRY. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 9/23/2019. (srb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 OBJECTION to #4 Report and Recommendations by Defendant Wright-Patt Credit Union. (pb)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION1 THAT: (1) PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; AND (2) THIS CASE BE TERMINATED ON THE COURTS DOCKET. Objections to R&R due by 9/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 8/26/19. (kma)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Wright-Patt Credit Union, filed by Travis Lanier Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (kma)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER AND ENTRY: (1) GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES; AND (2) HOLDING SERVICE PENDING INITIAL REVIEW UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1915. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 8/7/2019. (srb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The Office of the Clerk is in possession of all necessary service documents) by Plaintiff Travis Lanier Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Summons Form, #4 Exhibit A) (srb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Wright-Patt Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright-Patt Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Lanier Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?