Leitch v. Wal-Mart, Inc.
Plaintiff: Stacy L. Leitch
Defendant: Wal-Mart, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00235
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Ovington
Referring Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 12/6/2019. Settlement Demand due by 12/6/2019. Medical Package due by 12/6/2019. Motions to Amend due by 1/6/2020. Motions directed to pleadings due by 1/6/2020. Lay Witness due by 3/6/2020. Plaintiff and Defendant Primary Expert due by 6/30/2020. Plaintiff and Defendant Rebuttal Expert due by 8/28/2020. Request for Admissions due by 8/28/2020. Discovery due by 9/30/2020. Status Conference set for 10/15/2020 10:30 AM in Teleconference before Judge Thomas M. Rose. Summary Judgment Motions Deadline by 10/30/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2021 02:30 PM in Chambers before Judge Thomas M. Rose. Exhibit Delivered to the Courtroom Deputy Deadline due by 5/5/2021. Jury Trial set for 5/10/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Dayton before Judge Thomas M. Rose. Case is referred to Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 9/27/19. (kma)
September 26, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held : Initial Pretrial Conference held on 9/26/2019. Scheduling Order to issue. (ep)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 26(f) REPORT of the Parties by Plaintiff Stacy L. Leitch. (Ignozzi, Kenneth)
August 12, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference is set for Thursday, September 26, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. before Judge Thomas M. Rose. Parties shall call 1-888-684-8852, enter access code 1916636, enter security code 9262019 and wait for the Court to join the conference.***Prior to the pretrial conference counsel must comply with the MANDATORY DISCLOSURE RULES of Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a)(1) and the MANDATORY, pre-preliminary pretrial conference between counsel, required by Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(f). NOTE: the format for the Rule 26(f) conference between counsel and the report to the Court has been altered. This new form is available on line and MUST be utilized in this case. THE REPORT MUST BE FILED 7 DAYS PRIOR TO THE PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. In all cases with class action allegations, the parties shall include in their Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) report proposed deadlines for completing discovery relevant to those allegations and for filing a motion to certify a class, and a proposed date for class action determination. Pretrial procedures and forms can be found at our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov. (ep)
August 8, 2019 Notice: If case is to be referred it will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington. (kma)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 (Copy of Answer) ANSWER to #3 Complaint originally filed in Greene County Common Pleas Court under case number 2019 CV0447. (kma)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 (COPY OF)COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Wal-Mart, Inc., originally filed in Greene County Common Pleas Court on July 5, 2019, under case number 2019CV0447. (kma)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Wal-Mart, Inc.. (Starts, Carrie)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Greene County, case number 2019CV0447 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7049570), filed by Wal-Mart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Stipulation, #3 Exhibit State Court Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit Answer, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Starts, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leitch v. Wal-Mart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart, Inc.
Represented By: Carrie Masters Starts
Represented By: Adair Martin Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy L. Leitch
Represented By: Kenneth J. Ignozzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?