The Townhouses of Catalpa Phase I Condominium Owners Association v. Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: The Townhouses of Catalpa Phase I Condominium Owners Association
Defendant: Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00270
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Walter H Rice
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER sustaining #7 Joint MOTION to Continue Preliminary Pre-Trial Telephone Conference. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 10/03/2019. (tp)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Continue Preliminary Pre-Trial Telephone Conference by Plaintiff The Townhouses of Catalpa Phase I Condominium Owners Association. (Bacon, Steven)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 26(f) REPORT Joint Report of the Parties filed by Plaintiff The Townhouses of Catalpa Phase I Condominium Owners Association. (Bacon, Steven)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff The Townhouses of Catalpa Phase I Condominium Owners Association. (Bacon, Steven)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America re #3 Complaint Supplemental Cover Sheet (Meyer, Kurt)
September 4, 2019 Notice: If case is to be referred it will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman. (kma)
September 4, 2019 NOTICE re #3 Complaint - Notice of Removal cases must be accompanied by a supplemental civil cover sheet which is a form available from the Clerk and on the Courts website at http://www.ohsd.uscourts.gov/ohio-southern-district-forms. Please file a supplemental civil cover sheet using the event Civil-Other Filings-Notices-Notice (Other) and link the document back to the complaint. (kma)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 (Copy of)COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, originally filed in Montgomery County Common Pleas Court on July 25, 2019, under case number 2019 CV 03438. re #2 . (kma)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Meyer, Kurt)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montgomery County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CV-03438 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7088153), filed by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A Complaint) (Meyer, Kurt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Townhouses of Catalpa Phase I Condominium Owners Association v. Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Kurt D Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Townhouses of Catalpa Phase I Condominium Owners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?