Reynolds & Reynolds Company, Inc. v. Alan Vines Automotive of Jackson, LLC
Plaintiff: The Reynolds & Reynolds Company, Inc. and Reynolds &Reynolds Company, Inc
Defendant: Alan Vines Automotive of Jackson, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00276
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 9:9
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Alan Vines Automotive of Jackson, LLC. Alan Vines Automotive of Jackson, LLC served on 10/14/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (Pierce, David)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Alan Vines Automotive of Jackson, LLC. (srb)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Pierce, David)
September 6, 2019 NOTICE re 4 Request for Issuance of Summons: Counsel is directed to refile request for issuance of summons and attach the correct document, summons forms, found on the court's website, www.ohsd.uscourts.gov, under the forms tab. Document filed, was the petition/motion to confirm arbitration award. Document will be restricted. (kma)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Reynolds &Reynolds Company, Inc. (Pierce, David)
September 6, 2019 NOTICE re 3 Complaint: Counsel is notified to refile corporate disclosure statement using the correct event, corporate disclosure statement, located under civil,other filings, other documents, corporate disclosure statement and link back to the original filing, document 3 . (kma)
September 6, 2019 Notice of Correction re: 2 Complaint- Civil Cover Sheet: CA refiled civil cover sheet because it was filed under the incorrect event initially. (kma)
September 6, 2019 Notice: If case is to be referred it will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington. (kma)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE: Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint. (kma)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Petition/Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award against Alan Vines Automotive of Jackson, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7094840), filed by The Reynolds & Reynolds Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7) (Pierce, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynolds & Reynolds Company, Inc. v. Alan Vines Automotive of Jackson, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Reynolds & Reynolds Company, Inc.
Represented By: David Philip Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reynolds &Reynolds Company, Inc
Represented By: David Philip Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Vines Automotive of Jackson, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?