Data Cloud Solutions, LLC v. Department of Homeland Security
Plaintiff: Data Cloud Solutions, LLC
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 3:2019cv00305
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services,Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II. (kma)
October 15, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. to Attorney General (Larson, David)
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. to US Attorney (Larson, David)
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. on Cucinelli (Larson, David)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. on USCIS (Larson, David)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Plaintiff Data Cloud Solutions, LLC re #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet (Larson, David)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Department of Homeland Security c/o U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General, and Office of General Counsel (jmb)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. On US Attorney in Dayton (Larson, David)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. On US Attorney General (Larson, David)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. on USCIS (Larson, David)
September 24, 2019 Notice of Correction : All adversary proceedings which involve the United States government or any of its federal agencies must be served upon the Attorney General along with the appropriate government agency and a copy upon the U.S. Attorney. Counsel is instructed to request the appropriate summons. (jmb)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services,c/o Office of the General Counsel (jmb)
September 24, 2019 If case is referred it will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington. (jmb)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. DCS v USDHS (Larson, David)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Data Cloud Solutions, LLC against United States Department of Homeland Security ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7120547), filed by Data Cloud Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H-1B Petition Denial) (Larson, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Data Cloud Solutions, LLC v. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Data Cloud Solutions, LLC
Represented By: David Eli Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?