Morgan Stanley v. Hale
Plaintiff: Morgan Stanley
Defendant: Richard "Rip" Hale
Case Number: 3:2019cv00327
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Walter H Rice
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held: Telephone Conference held on 11/20/2019. The Court will rule on the pending motions and set a conference call after the rulings. (tp)
November 19, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Morgan Stanley. (Rodman, Rachael)
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Defendant Richard "Rip" Hale. (Newman, Peter)
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Plaintiff Morgan Stanley. (Rodman, Rachael)
November 8, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Defendant Richard "Rip" Hale. (Newman, Peter)
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Morgan Stanley. (Rodman, Rachael)
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Morgan Stanley. (Rodman, Rachael)
October 17, 2019 Notice: If case is to be referred it will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington. (kma)
October 17, 2019 Filing 5 (Copy of) MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award originally filed in Montgomery County Common Pleas Court on October 2, 2019, under case number 2019 CV 04557. by Plaintiff Morgan Stanley. (kma)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Defendant Richard "Rip" Hale re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Notice of Appearance, #3 Notice (Other), (Newman, Peter)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Defendant Richard "Rip" Hale re #2 Notice of Appearance, #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Summons Form, #2 Filing Fee Receipt, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Motion for 5K1.1, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit) (Newman, Peter)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Kevin Newman for Defendant Richard "Rip" Hale (Newman, Peter)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montgomery County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019 CV 04557 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7157573), filed by Richard "Rip" Hale. (Newman, Peter) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2019: #1 Notice of Removal) (pb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan Stanley v. Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Stanley
Represented By: Rachael Leigh Rodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard "Rip" Hale
Represented By: Peter Kevin Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?