Arnold v. Speedway, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Arnold
Defendant: Speedway, LLC and David Coterel
Case Number: 3:2019cv00340
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers added. Judge Michael J. Newman no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 11/16/2020. (ss)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 10-13-2020. (de)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING CASE SCHEDULE: Cut-off for request for admissions: January 15, 2021Discovery cut-off deadline: February 19, 2021. Telephone status conference following discovery: March 18, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. Summary judgment motions: April 29, 2021Final pre-trial conference: October 28, 2021 at 2:30 p.m. in Chambers before Judge Thomas M. Rose. Trial to a jury beginning: December 6, 2021 at 9:00 a.m. 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Dayton before Judge Thomas M. Rose. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 8/11/20. (pb) Modified on 8/11/2020 (pb).
August 7, 2020 Filing 19 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 1/15/2021. of Case Schedule by Defendant Speedway, LLC. (Niedecken, Brooke)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTATION ORDER: This case is before the Court on the notice filed by Plaintiff's counsel withdrawing his motion to withdraw from representation in this matter (doc. #17 ). Pursuant to Plaintiff's counsel's notice in this regard, counsel's motion to withdraw from representation (doc. #15 ) is DENIED AS MOOT and the telephonic hearing set for August 6, 2020 at 2:00 pm is VACATED. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 8/5/2020. (mhr)
August 4, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Timothy Arnold re #15 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Bruce, Matthew)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTATION ORDER: This civil case is set for a telephonic hearing on August 6, 2020 at 2:00 pm with regard to the motion of Plaintiff's counsel to withdraw from representation (doc. #15 ) in this case. Plaintiff is ORDERED to attend the hearing along with his current counsel of record. Plaintiff is NOTIFIED that his failure to attend the telephonic hearing may result in the issuance of sanctions, up to and including the dismissal of this case for failure to prosecute. To attend and participate in the hearing, Plaintiff and counsel for the parties shall call: 1-888-278-0296, enter access code 2725365, security code 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. Plaintiff's counsel is ORDERED to send a copy of this Order directly to Plaintiff and to further advise him of the potential consequences for failing to appear as ordered herein. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 7/22/2020. (mnr)
July 20, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff Timothy Arnold. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Matthew Bruce) (Bruce, Matthew)
April 16, 2020 Filing 14 Minute Entry: This civil case came before the Court for a discovery status conference by telephone on 4/16/2020. Attorneys Matthew Bruce, Brooke Niedecken, and Sarah Squillante participated. Counsel represented that discovery is progressing and that no disputes are anticipated at present. Counsel were advised to contact the Court should discovery issues arise requiring Court intervention or should the parties seek mediation. (mnr) Modified on 4/16/2020 (mnr).
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER - The telephone conference previously scheduled for 4/14/2020 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED AND RESCHEDULED for 4/16/2020 at 10:30 a.m. Counsel shall call: 1-888-278-0296, enter access code 2725365, security code 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 4/9/2020. (dm)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTATION ORDER: This case has been referred to Judge Newman for discovery. Accordingly, the undersigned sets this case for a discovery status conference by telephone on 4/14/2020 at 10:30 am. Counsel shall call: 1-888-278-0296, enter access code 2725365, security code 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 3/2/2020. (mnr)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Case is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman Lay Witness due by 6/19/2020. Plaintiff Primary Expert due by 7/10/2020. Plaintiff Rebuttal Expert due by 9/18/2020. Defendant Primary Expert due by 8/14/2020. Defendant Rebuttal Expert due by 9/18/2020. Request for Admissions due by 10/15/2020. Discovery due by 11/20/2020. Status Conference set for 12/17/2020 10:00 AM by Teleconference before Judge Thomas M. Rose. Summary Judgment Motions Deadline by 1/29/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/29/2021 02:30 PM in Chambers before Judge Thomas M. Rose. Exhibit List due by 8/25/2021. Jury Trial set for 8/30/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Dayton before Judge Thomas M. Rose. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 2/28/20. (pb)
February 28, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas M. Rose: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/27/2020. Scheduling Order to issue. (ep)
January 23, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah K. Squillante for Defendant Speedway, LLC (Squillante, Sarah)
January 22, 2020 Filing 10 RULE 26(f) REPORT of the Parties by Defendant Speedway, LLC. (Squillante, Sarah)
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Speedway, LLC, Marathon Petroleum Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Marathon Petroleum Corporation for Speedway, LLC.. (Niedecken, Brooke)
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Speedway, LLC. (Niedecken, Brooke)
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Plaintiff Timothy Arnold DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT DAVID COTEREL (Bruce, Matthew)
December 12, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Answer due 12/20/19. (ep)
November 29, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION by Defendants David Coterel, Speedway, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Niedecken, Brooke)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants David Coterel, Speedway, LLC. David Coterel served on 11/6/2019, answer due 11/27/2019; Speedway, LLC served on 11/6/2019, answer due 11/27/2019. (cb)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 Clerk's CERTIFICATE of Mailing re #1 Complaint and #3 Summons Issued. (eh)
October 24, 2019 Notice: If case is to be referred it will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman. (kma)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to David Coterel, Speedway, LLC. (jlw)
October 23, 2019 Case transferred in from Cincinnati Division on 10/23/2019 Case Number 1:19-cv-892. Case assigned to Judge Thomas M. Rose.. (jlw)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER : Pursuant to Local Rule 82.1, this case is hereby transferred from the docket of the Honorable Michael R. Barrett to the Office of the Clerk for reassignment to the Western Division of the Southern District of Ohio at Dayton.. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 10/23/2019. (jlw)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7165107), filed by Timothy Arnold. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Right To Sue, #3 Summons Form Summons) (Bruce, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnold v. Speedway, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedway, LLC
Represented By: Brooke Elizabeth Niedecken
Represented By: Sarah K. Squillante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Coterel
Represented By: Brooke Elizabeth Niedecken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Arnold
Represented By: Evan R McFarland
Represented By: Matthew G Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?