Stanford et al v. Northmont City Schools et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe, John Doe, Dwain A Stanford and Sharon Stanford
Defendant: James Chad Kaltenbach, Tony Thomas, Linda Blum, Northmont City School District, City of Clayton, Ohio and Michael Barrow
Case Number: 3:2019cv00399
Filed: December 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Douglas R Cole
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Linda Blum answer due 2/28/2020; James Chad Kaltenbach answer due 2/28/2020; Tony Thomas answer due 2/28/2020. (pb)
February 11, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: City of Clayton, Ohio answer due 3/19/2020. (pb)
February 10, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Tony Thomas on 12/30/2019, answer due 2/28/2020. (Baker, Christine) Modified on 2/11/2020 (pb). To Correct service and answer date
February 10, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to James Chad Kaltenbach on 12/30/2019, answer due 2/28/2020. (Baker, Christine) Modified on 2/11/2020 (pb). To correct service and answer date
February 10, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Linda Blum on 12/30/2019, answer due 2/28/2020. (Baker, Christine) Modified on 2/11/2020 (pb). To correct service and answer date
February 10, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Northmont City School District on 12/30/2019, answer due 2/28/2020. (Baker, Christine)
February 10, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Michael Barrow on 12/30/2019, answer due 2/28/2020. (Baker, Christine)
February 10, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to City of Clayton, Ohio on 1/19/2020, answer due 3/19/2020. (Baker, Christine) Modified on 2/11/2020 (pb). to correct service and answer date
December 30, 2019 Notice of Correction re: #2 Request for Waiver of Service, shall not be filed on docket. Only executed Waiver of Service to be filed. Counsel Notified. No further action is required. (jmb)
December 30, 2019 If case is referred it will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington. (jmb)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT (with assigned Judge and case number) against Michael Barrow, Linda Blum, Clayton, Ohio, James Chad Kaltenbach, Northmont City Schools Northmont City Schools, Tony Thomas, filed by John Doe, Dwain A Stanford, Jane Doe, Sharon Stanford. (Baker, Christine)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Tabitha Justice on December 23, 2019 by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, John Doe, Dwain A Stanford, Sharon Stanford. Waiver of Service due by 1/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form, #2 Summons Form) (Baker, Christine)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (filing prepaid receip 0648-7254877) against Michael Barrow, Linda Blum, Clayton, Ohio, James Chad Kaltenbach, Northmont City Schools Northmont City Schools, Tony Thomas, filed by John Doe, Dwain A Stanford, Jane Doe, Sharon Stanford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Baker, Christine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanford et al v. Northmont City Schools et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Christine Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Christine Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwain A Stanford
Represented By: Christine Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Stanford
Represented By: Christine Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Chad Kaltenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Blum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northmont City School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Clayton, Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Barrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?