Lockhart et al v. Garzella et al
Plaintiff: M Christopher Lockhart, Julian Castelli, Gary M Kopacka, Cybeck Capital VI, LLC, Thomas J Meyer, Thomas W Thompson, Evan C Barrett, James R Sever, Diane R Meyer, Bill Mestdagh, Jim Brunke, Donald Slivensky, Donald Slivensky Living Trust, Greg Bell and Daniel Epperson
Defendant: John Wootton, CFO Solutions, LLC, Jack Garzella, HB Henrickson and JB Henricksen
Case Number: 3:2019cv00405
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Walter H Rice
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Change Venue by Defendant John Wootton. (pb)
February 24, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: CFO Solutions, LLC answer due 3/25/2020; JB Henricksen answer due 3/25/2020. (kma)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER sustaining- re #11 Stipulated Leave to Plead, filed by JB Henricksen, CFO Solutions, LLC. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 02/24/2020. (tp)
February 21, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants CFO Solutions, LLC, CFO Solutions, L.C. identifying Corporate Parent CFO Solutions, L.C. for CFO Solutions, LLC.. (Mathews, Tyler)
February 21, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph M. Muska for Defendants CFO Solutions, LLC, JB Henricksen (Muska, Joseph)
February 20, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 3/25/2020. Stipulated Leave to Plead by Defendants CFO Solutions, LLC, JB Henricksen. (Mathews, Tyler) Modified on 2/21/2020 to terminate motion per WHR lawclerk (kma).
February 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler L Mathews for Defendants CFO Solutions, LLC, JB Henricksen (Mathews, Tyler)
February 14, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant JB Henricksen. JB Henricksen served on 2/12/2020, answer due 3/4/2020. (Foos, Martin)
February 14, 2020 NOTICE re 8 Affidavit of Service. Counsel find document using the wrong event, please refile using Summons Returned Executed; which is located under Civil Events - Initial Pleadings and Service - Service of Process. Thank you. (srb)
February 11, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to JB Henricksen. (kma)
February 11, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Foos, Martin)
February 7, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to John Wootton on 12/31/2019, answer due 3/2/2020. (Foos, Martin)
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Jack Garzella on 12/31/2019, answer due 3/2/2020. (Foos, Martin)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to CFO Solutions, LLC on 12/31/2019, answer due 3/2/2020. (Foos, Martin)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Plaintiff M Christopher Lockhart re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet (Foos, Martin)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7259782), filed by M Christopher Lockhart. (Foos, Martin)
December 30, 2019 If case is to be referred, it will be Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington (pb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lockhart et al v. Garzella et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M Christopher Lockhart
Represented By: Martin A Foos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian Castelli
Represented By: Martin A Foos
Represented By: Terry W. Posey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary M Kopacka
Represented By: Martin A Foos
Represented By: Terry W. Posey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cybeck Capital VI, LLC
Represented By: Martin A Foos
Represented By: Terry W. Posey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas J Meyer
Represented By: Martin A Foos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas W Thompson
Represented By: Martin A Foos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evan C Barrett
Represented By: Martin A Foos
Represented By: Terry W. Posey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R Sever
Represented By: Martin A Foos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane R Meyer
Represented By: Martin A Foos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Mestdagh
Represented By: Martin A Foos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Brunke
Represented By: Martin A Foos
Represented By: Terry W. Posey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Slivensky
Represented By: Martin A Foos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Slivensky Living Trust
Represented By: Martin A Foos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Bell
Represented By: Martin A Foos
Represented By: Terry W. Posey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Epperson
Represented By: Martin A Foos
Represented By: Terry W. Posey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Wootton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CFO Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Joseph M. Muska
Represented By: Tyler L Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Garzella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HB Henrickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JB Henricksen
Represented By: Joseph M. Muska
Represented By: Tyler L Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?