JTH Tax LLC dba Liberty Tax Service et al v. Reed et al
Plaintiff: JTH Tax LLC dba Liberty Tax Service and SiempreTax+ LLC
Defendant: Liberty Solutions Corp., Taija Morton Owens, Latasha Owens, I-Max Legacy Tax Services dba I-Max Tax and David M Reed
Case Number: 3:2020cv00126
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Oppose Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #24 , is GRANTED. While Plaintiff has yet to comply with Local Rule 65.1 ("The movant shall obtain, from the office of the Judge to whom the action is assigned, a date and time for the informal conference and shall immediately notify counsel for the adverse party, if known, or if not known, the adverse party, that the application has been filed or is to be filed and the date, time, and location of the conference."), no conference will be set prior to June 12, 2020. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 6-4-2020. (de)
June 3, 2020 Filing 24 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #22 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction New date requested 6/12/2020. by Defendants Taija Morton Owens, Latasha Owens. (Sandner, Michael)
June 3, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W Sandner for Defendants Taija Morton Owens, Latasha Owens (Sandner, Michael)
May 13, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs JTH Tax LLC dba Liberty Tax Service, SiempreTax LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Clifford Birnbaum, #3 Exhibit Declaration of John Amburgey, #4 Exhibit A-Service Mark, #5 Exhibit B-Service Mark, #6 Exhibit C-Franchise Agreement, #7 Exhibit D-Franchise Agreement, #8 Exhibit E-Franchise Agreement, #9 Exhibit F-Franchise Agreement, #10 Exhibit G-Notice to Cure, #11 Exhibit H-Termination Notice, #12 Exhibit I-Articles of Organization, #13 Exhibit J-Cease and Desist Letter, #14 Exhibit K-Facebook Post, #15 Exhibit L-Scheduler, #16 Exhibit M-Photo of Location, #17 Exhibit N-Photo of Business Card, #18 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Brunton, Gregory)
May 7, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Taija Morton Owens. (Brunton, Gregory)
May 7, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Latasha Owens. (Brunton, Gregory)
May 7, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant I-Max Legacy Tax Services dba I-Max Tax. (Brunton, Gregory)
May 1, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint For Injunctive Relief and Damages filed by Taija Morton Owens. (jg)
May 1, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint for Injunctive Relief and Damages filed by Latasha Owens. (jg)
April 23, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Liberty Solutions Corp., David M Reed. (Mancz, Barry)
April 21, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Liberty Solutions Corp.. Liberty Solutions Corp. served on 4/10/2020, answer due 5/1/2020. (Brunton, Gregory)
April 21, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant David M Reed. David M Reed served on 4/10/2020, answer due 5/1/2020. (Brunton, Gregory)
April 21, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Taija Morton Owens. Taija Morton Owens served on 4/10/2020, answer due 5/1/2020. (Brunton, Gregory)
April 21, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Latasha Owens. Latasha Owens served on 4/10/2020, answer due 5/1/2020. (Brunton, Gregory)
April 21, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant I-Max Legacy Tax Services dba I-Max Tax. I-Max Legacy Tax Services dba I-Max Tax served on 4/10/2020, answer due 5/1/2020. (Brunton, Gregory)
April 21, 2020 NOTICE re 6 , 7 , 8 , 9 and 10 Affidavit of Service. Counsel used incorrect docketing event when filing their service; counsel please re-file using Summons Issued; which is located under Civil-Initial Pleadings and Service-Service of Process. Documents 6-10 will be restricted on docket. Thank you. (srb)
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to I-Max Legacy Tax Services dba I-Max Tax, Liberty Solutions Corp., Taija Morton Owens, Latasha Owens, David M Reed. (kma)
April 7, 2020 Notice: If case is referred it will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington. (kma)
April 6, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form David M. Reed, #2 Summons Form Liberty Solutions Corp., #3 Summons Form I-Max Legacy Tax Services LLC, #4 Summons Form Latasha Owens, #5 Summons Form Taija Owens) (Brunton, Gregory)
April 6, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs SiempreTax LLC, Franchise Group Intermediate L 2, LLC, Franchise Group Intermediate L 1, LLC, Franchise Group Intermediate L, LLC, Franchise Group New Holdco, LLC, Franchise Group, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Franchise Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Franchise Group Intermediate L 2, LLC, Other Affiliate Franchise Group Intermediate L 1, LLC, Other Affiliate Franchise Group Intermediate L, LLC, Other Affiliate Franchise Group New Holdco, LLC for SiempreTax LLC.. (Brunton, Gregory)
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs JTH Tax LLC dba Liberty Tax Service, Franchise Group, Inc., Franchise Group Intermediate L 2, LLC, Franchise Group Intermediate L 1, LLC, Franchise Group Intermediate L, LLC, Franchise Group New Holdco, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Franchise Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Franchise Group Intermediate L 2, LLC, Other Affiliate Franchise Group Intermediate L 1, LLC, Other Affiliate Franchise Group Intermediate L, LLC, Other Affiliate Franchise Group New Holdco, LLC for JTH Tax LLC dba Liberty Tax Service.. (Brunton, Gregory)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND Verified Complaint for Injunctive Relief and Damages against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7411528), filed by JTH Tax LLC dba Liberty Tax Service, SiempreTax LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Liberty Franchise Agmt OH035, #3 Exhibit B-Liberty Franchise Agmt OH359, #4 Exhibit C-Franchise Agmt OH373, #5 Exhibit D-SiempreTax Franchise Agmt OH035, #6 Exhibit E-TM 2314991, #7 Exhibit F-TM 2465670, #8 Exhibit G-TM 2479692, #9 Exhibit H-TM 2459756, #10 Exhibit I-TM 3167134, #11 Exhibit J-Notices to Cure, #12 Exhibit K-Termination Notice) (Brunton, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JTH Tax LLC dba Liberty Tax Service et al v. Reed et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Solutions Corp.
Represented By: Barry Wayne Mancz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taija Morton Owens
Represented By: Michael W Sandner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latasha Owens
Represented By: Michael W Sandner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I-Max Legacy Tax Services dba I-Max Tax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M Reed
Represented By: Barry Wayne Mancz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JTH Tax LLC dba Liberty Tax Service
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Represented By: Carrie Thiem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SiempreTax+ LLC
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?