United States of America v. One 2013 Ford Escape VIN: 1FMCU0HX4DUD66654, with all attachments thereon
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: One 2013 Ford Escape VIN: 1FMCU0HX4DUD66654, with all attachments thereon
Claimant: Magnum Auto Sales, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00208
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Douglas R Cole
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Magnum Auto Sales, Inc.. (Cicero, Anthony)
July 14, 2020 Filing 5 CLAIM Verified by Claimant Magnum Auto Sales, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Title, #2 Exhibit Payment History) (Cicero, Anthony)
June 4, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant One 2013 Ford Escape VIN: 1FMCU0HX4DUD66654, with all attachments thereon. One 2013 Ford Escape VIN: 1FMCU0HX4DUD66654, with all attachments thereon served on 12/17/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. (Grimes, Deborah)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER FOR WARRANT of Arrest in Rem. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 6/2/20. (sct)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to One 2013 Ford Escape VIN: 1FMCU0HX4DUD66654, with all attachments thereon. (kma)
June 2, 2020 Notice: If case is to be referred it will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman. (kma)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against One 2013 Ford Escape VIN: 1FMCU0HX4DUD66654, with all attachments thereon, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Grimes, Deborah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. One 2013 Ford Escape VIN: 1FMCU0HX4DUD66654, with all attachments thereon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 2013 Ford Escape VIN: 1FMCU0HX4DUD66654, with all attachments thereon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Deborah Diane Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Magnum Auto Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony R Cicero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?