Smith v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Celeste Smith
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2020cv00299
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Ovington
Referring Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting as unopposed #6 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's answer is due 11/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 9-11-20. (mcm)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 11/16/2020. by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Sorkin, Adam)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Sharon L. Ovington. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of a final judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 08/04/2020. (jmb)
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 JOINT CONSENT OF THE PARTIES TO PROCEED BEFORE THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE . (Sorkin, Adam)
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam R. Sorkin for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Sorkin, Adam) Modified Attorney Role on 7/29/2020 (rp).
July 17, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Commissioner of Social Security answer due 9/15/2020. (kma)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7559719), filed by Celeste Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rake, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Represented By: Adam R. Sorkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celeste Smith
Represented By: Michael A Rake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?