Shackelford v. Commisioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Karen Shackelford
Defendant: Commisioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2020cv00339
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael J Newman
Referring Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTATION ORDER: For good cause shown, the Commissioner's motion for an extension of time to file the administrative record (doc. #5 ) is GRANTED. The Commissioner shall file the administrative record on or before December 11, 2020. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 10/8/2020. (mhr) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 8, 2020 Filing 5 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 12/11/2020. by Defendant Commisioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Jebby Rasputnis) (Julis, Rachel)
October 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Julis for Defendant Commisioner of Social Security (Julis, Rachel)
August 13, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Commisioner of Social Security answer due 10/12/2020. (kma)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Commisioner of Social Security, filed by Karen Shackelford. (kma)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER GRANTING #1 PLAINTIFF'S Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 8/13/2020. (dm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The Office of the Clerk is in possession of all necessary service documents) by Petitioner Karen Shackelford. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 SS Identification Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (pb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shackelford v. Commisioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commisioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Represented By: Rachel Julis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Shackelford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?