Quillen Smith v. U.S. Bank National Association
Plaintiff: Charlotte Quillen Smith
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Case Number: 3:2020cv00364
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Walter H Rice
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Filing 13 DECISION AND ENTRY SUSTAINING DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO SET ASIDE CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO ANSWER (DOC. #9 ); ANSWER TO BE FILED BY OCTOBER 28, 2020; OVERRULING AS MOOT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DOC. #8 . - Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(c), and for good cause shown, the Court SUSTAINS Defendants unopposed Motion to Set Aside Clerks Entry of Default and for Additional Time to Answer, Doc. #9 . As requested, Defendant may have until October 28, 2020, to file its Answer. The Court OVERRULES AS MOOT Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment, Doc. #8 . Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 10/22/2020. (srb)
October 20, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Set Aside Default and Additional Time to Answer filed by Plaintiff Charlotte Quillen Smith. (Matthews, Craig)
October 14, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Evan T Priestle for Defendant U.S. Bank National Association (Priestle, Evan)
October 14, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants U.S. Bank National Association, US Bancorp identifying Corporate Parent US Bancorp for U.S. Bank National Association.. (Rogers, Gregory)
October 14, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Set Aside Default and Additional Time to Answer by Defendant U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer Long, #2 Declaration of Jeff Brockmann) (Rogers, Gregory)
October 8, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment , MOTION for Default Judgment against U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION DBA US BANK ( Responses due by 10/29/2020) by Plaintiff Charlotte Quillen Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Matthews, Craig)
October 8, 2020 Filing 7 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant U.S. Bank National Association. (kma)
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT of Craig T. Matthews for Default by Plaintiff Charlotte Quillen Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Matthews, Craig) Modified on 10/8/2020 to change docket text per WHR lawclerk (kma).
October 7, 2020 Filing 5 DECISION AND ENTRY OVERRULING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DOC. #4 ). Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 10/6/2020. (srb)
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Default Judgment against U.S. BANK National Association dba U.S. Bank by Plaintiff Charlotte Quillen Smith. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Matthews, Craig)
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant U.S. Bank National Association. U.S. Bank National Association served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020. (Matthews, Craig)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to U.S. Bank National Association. (srb)
August 31, 2020 ...If this case is referred it will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman... (srb)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against U.S. Bank National Association ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7630942), filed by Charlotte Quillen Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons Form Summons) (Matthews, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quillen Smith v. U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Quillen Smith
Represented By: Craig Thomas Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Gregory Parker Rogers
Represented By: Evan T Priestle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?