Henken v. IW Trust Funds
Plaintiff: Jeremy Henken
Defendant: IW Trust Funds
Case Number: 3:2020cv00371
Filed: September 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
Presiding Judge: Douglas R Cole
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441eb
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2020 If case is to be referred, it will be Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington (pb)
September 5, 2020 Filing 18 Case transferred in from District of Kentucky Western; Case Number 3:20-cv-00235. Original file electronic copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 9/4/2020 granting #12 Motion to Change Venue, for the reasons set forth in the memorandum opinion entered herein this date (DN #16 ). Case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio for all further proceedings. cc: Counsel; USDC OHSD (CDF) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 9/5/2020.]
September 4, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM OPINION by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 9/4/2020 re #12 MOTION to Change Venue. For the reasons stated herein, the Court will grant Defendants' motion to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio. A separate order will be entered in accordance with this opinion. cc: Counsel (CDF) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 9/5/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Annuity Fund With Prejudice and Amend Case Caption by Defendant IW Trust Funds (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hoffman, Joseph) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 9/5/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Defendant Annuity Fund) filed by IW Trust Funds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Giles v. Bouchard, #2 Exhibit B Annuity Plan Document) (Hoffman, Joseph) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 9/5/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Defendant Annuity Fund) filed by Jeremy Henken. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Florio, Robert) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 9/5/2020.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Change Venue by Defendant IW Trust Funds (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Pension Plan, #2 Exhibit B Amend 1, #3 Exhibit C Amend 2, #4 Exhibit D Amend 3, #5 Exhibit E Amend 4, #6 Exhibit F Amend 5, #7 Exhibit G Amend 6, #8 Exhibit H Amend 7, #9 Exhibit I Pension SMM, #10 Exhibit J Annuity Plan, #11 Exhibit K Amend 1, #12 Exhibit L Amend 2, #13 Exhibit M Amend 3, #14 Exhibit N Amend 4, #15 Exhibit O Amend 5, #16 Exhibit P Amend 6, #17 Exhibit Q Annuity SPD, #18 Exhibit R Annuity SMM, #19 Exhibit S Pension Trust Agree., #20 Exhibit T Annuity Trust Agree., #21 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Liva, Sara) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 9/5/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Filing 11 Proposed Order by IW Trust Funds. (Liva, Sara) Modified on 4/28/2020 to attach as DN #10 -1 (ALS). [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 9/5/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Defendant Annuity Fund) by Defendant IW Trust Funds (Liva, Sara) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/28/2020: #1 Proposed Order) (ALS). [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 9/5/2020.]
April 14, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by IW Trust Funds. (Liva, Sara) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 9/5/2020.]
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 4/9/2020, GRANTING #4 #5 and #7 Motions for Joseph C. Hoffman, Jr., Joseph D. Mando, and Sara A. Liva to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the Defendant. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel, QC(RLK) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 9/5/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Sara A. Liva to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3079027. by Defendant IW Trust Funds (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Admission Pro Hac Vice) (Schulz, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/8/2020: #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (ALS). [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 9/5/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Filing 6 Terminated -- Motion to Appear PHV was filed using the event MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis in error. Motion was re-filed using the correct event. See #7 . Modified on 4/8/2020 (RLK). [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 9/5/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Joseph D. Mando to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3078999. by Defendant IW Trust Funds (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Admission Pro Hac Vice) (Schulz, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/8/2020: #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (ALS). [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 9/5/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Joseph C. Hoffman Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3078972. by Defendant IW Trust Funds (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Admission Pro Hac Vice) (Schulz, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/8/2020: #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (ALS). [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 9/5/2020.]
April 1, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Jefferson Circuit Court, Division 10, Civil Action No. 20-CI-01560. cc: Counsel; Jefferson Circuit Court (JWM) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 9/5/2020.]
April 1, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. (JWM) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 9/5/2020.]
April 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by IW Trust Funds from Jefferson Circuit Court, Division 10, case number 20-CI-01560. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 0644-3075356 ) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Pleadings, #2 Cover Sheet) (JWM) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 9/5/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henken v. IW Trust Funds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Henken
Represented By: Robert A. Florio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IW Trust Funds
Represented By: Thomas J. Schulz
Represented By: Joseph D Mando
Represented By: Sara A. Liva
Represented By: Joseph C. Hoffman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?