Dixon v. Warden, Lebanon Correctional Institution
Petitioner: Deandre D. Dixon
Respondent: Warden, Lebanon Correctional Institution
Case Number: 3:2020cv00383
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
Presiding Judge: Douglas R Cole
Referring Judge: Michael R Merz
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 100CIN040234 (bjc)
September 15, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - It is respectfully recommended that the Petition herein be dismissed with prejudice. Because reasonable jurists would not disagree with this conclusion, it is also recommended that Petitioner be denied a certificate of appealability and that the Court certify to the Sixth Circuit that any appeal would be objectively frivolous and should not be permitted to proceed in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 9/29/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 9/15/2020. (kpf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
September 14, 2020 Case transferred in from Western Division at Cincinnati on 09/14/2020. Case Number 1:20-cv-701. Case assigned to Judge Douglas R. Cole and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz. (eh)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF TRANSFER signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 9/14/20. Pursuant to Local Rule 82.1(b) and (f), it is hereby ORDERED that this case be TRANSFERRED to Dayton location of this Court for all further proceedings. (eh)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Deandre D. Dixon (Case received as scanned without a p. 12, no civil cover sheet or fee). (kh) Modified docket text on 9/9/2020 (eh). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/9/2020: #1 Envelope) (kh). Modified docket text on 9/9/2020 (kh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon v. Warden, Lebanon Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, Lebanon Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Deandre D. Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?