Stewart et al v. Martin et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Stewart and Rachel Kosoff
Defendant: Callie Weinert, Chris Smith, David Martin, Jessica Martin, Betsy Smith, Christina Martin, Ellie Smith, Dominic Bertolino, Andrew Bertolino, Susan Weinert, Janet Bertolino, Kathryn Martin, Sam Martin, Callie Weinart, Elizabeth Bertolino and Hannah Weinert
Case Number: 3:2021cv00089
Filed: March 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2021 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to David Martin on 3/12/2021, answer due 5/11/2021. (Rosenberg, Jeffrey)
May 3, 2021 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Andrew Bertolino, Elizabeth Bertolino, Janet Bertolino, Jessica Martin, Kathryn Martin, Sam Martin, Betsy Smith, Chris Smith, Hannah Weinert, Susan Weinert. (srb)
April 29, 2021 Filing 15 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Betsy Martin Smith) (Rosenberg, Jeffrey)
April 29, 2021 Filing 14 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Janet Bertolino) (Rosenberg, Jeffrey)
April 29, 2021 Filing 13 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Susan Weinert) (Rosenberg, Jeffrey)
April 29, 2021 Filing 12 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Jessica Martin) (Rosenberg, Jeffrey)
April 29, 2021 Filing 11 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Kathryn Martin) (Rosenberg, Jeffrey)
April 29, 2021 Filing 10 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Sam Martin) (Rosenberg, Jeffrey)
April 29, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Hannah Weinert) (Rosenberg, Jeffrey)
April 29, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Elizabeth Bertolino) (Rosenberg, Jeffrey)
April 29, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Chris Smith) (Rosenberg, Jeffrey)
April 29, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Andrew Bertolino) (Rosenberg, Jeffrey)
April 8, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Dillon Laub for Defendant David Martin (Laub, Patricia)
April 7, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Maureen Allison Bickley for Defendant David Martin (Bickley, Maureen)
March 15, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency re: The filing fee was not submitted with the motion. The fee can be paid #online. Please scroll down to the event called, Pay Fees Via Pay.gov to pay the required fee. Related Document: #2 MOTION for Limited Admission PRO HAC VICE filed by Rachel Kosoff, Daniel Stewart. Deficiency Deadline by 3/29/2021. (jmb)
March 15, 2021 Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number AOHSDC-8216105. (Foos, Martin)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #2 Motion for Limited Admission - to appear pro hac vice of Jeffrey R. Rosenberg as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 03/15/2021. (jmb)
March 12, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Limited Admission PRO HAC VICE by Plaintiffs Rachel Kosoff, Daniel Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Foos, Martin)
March 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8212793), filed by Daniel Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Foos, Martin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart et al v. Martin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Callie Weinert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Martin
Represented By: Maureen Allison Bickley
Represented By: Patricia Dillon Laub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betsy Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominic Bertolino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Bertolino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Weinert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Bertolino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Callie Weinart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Bertolino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hannah Weinert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Stewart
Represented By: Martin A Foos
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Kosoff
Represented By: Martin A Foos
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?