Kettering Adventist Healthcare v. Jade Designs d/b/a Fully Promoted et al
Plaintiff: Kettering Adventist Healthcare
Defendant: Jade Designs d/b/a Fully Promoted and Jennifer Snyder
Case Number: 3:2021cv00136
Filed: May 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Alyssa E. Chirlin as Co-Counsel; granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christopher M. Drake as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel are directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 06/25/2021. (jmb) Modified on 6/30/2021 (jmb).
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8376406) of Christopher M. Drake by Defendants Jade Designs d/b/a Fully Promoted, Jennifer Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- CO Certificate of Good Standing) (Johnson, Timothy)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8376352) of Alyssa E. Chirlin by Defendants Jade Designs d/b/a Fully Promoted, Jennifer Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- CO Certificate of Good Standing) (Johnson, Timothy)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy D Johnson for Defendants Jade Designs d/b/a Fully Promoted, Jennifer Snyder (Johnson, Timothy)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Jennifer Snyder on 5/4/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (Lauchlan, Clifford)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Jade Designs d/b/a Fully Promoted on 5/4/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (Lauchlan, Clifford)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order If case is to be referred Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr. to be assigned. (ep)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE by Plaintiff Kettering Adventist Healthcare re #1 Complaint of Filing Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A March 2020 Invoice, #2 Exhibit B December 2020 Invoice) (Richardson, Eric)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Kettering Adventist Healthcare. (Richardson, Eric)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8294849), filed by Kettering Adventist Healthcare. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Richardson, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kettering Adventist Healthcare v. Jade Designs d/b/a Fully Promoted et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jade Designs d/b/a Fully Promoted
Represented By: Alyssa E, Chirlin
Represented By: Christopher M. Drake
Represented By: Timothy D Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Snyder
Represented By: Alyssa E, Chirlin
Represented By: Christopher M. Drake
Represented By: Timothy D Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kettering Adventist Healthcare
Represented By: Eric Wade Richardson
Represented By: Clifford W Lauchlan
Represented By: Jacob D. Mahle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?