Infinity Labs, LLC et al v. Radiance Technologies. Inc. et al
Plaintiff: JASON MOLNAR, Kurtis Glendenning, PH.D Kenneth Edge and Infinity Labs, LLC
Defendant: Radiance Technologies. Inc. and William C. Bailey, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00170
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Walter H Rice
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants William C. Bailey, Jr, Radiance Technologies. Inc.. (Pyers, Zachary)
August 6, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants William C. Bailey, Jr, Radiance Technologies. Inc.. (Pyers, Zachary)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER approving - re #7 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Move or Plead in Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Defendant Radiance Technologies. Inc. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 07/26/2021. (tp)
July 16, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Move or Plead in Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Defendant Radiance Technologies. Inc.. (Spyker, Thomas)
July 2, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant William C. Bailey, Jr. William C. Bailey, Jr served on 6/28/2021, answer due 7/19/2021. (Kirby, Tami)
July 1, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Radiance Technologies. Inc.. Radiance Technologies. Inc. served on 6/25/2021, answer due 7/16/2021. (Kirby, Tami)
June 28, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs Kenneth Edge, Kurtis Glendenning, Infinity Labs, LLC, Jason Molnar. (Kirby, Tami)
June 24, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to William C. Bailey, Jr., and Radiance Technologies. Inc. (jmb)
June 23, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Kirby, Tami)
June 23, 2021 ...If case is referred it will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington... (srb)
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND for Damages, Injunctive, and Other Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8370147), filed by Infinity Labs, LLC, Kurtis Glendenning, JASON MOLNAR, Kenneth Edge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kirby, Tami)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Infinity Labs, LLC et al v. Radiance Technologies. Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON MOLNAR
Represented By: Tami Hart Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurtis Glendenning
Represented By: Tami Hart Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PH.D Kenneth Edge
Represented By: Tami Hart Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Infinity Labs, LLC
Represented By: Tami Hart Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radiance Technologies. Inc.
Represented By: Thomas N. Spyker
Represented By: Zachary Benjamin Pyers
Represented By: Kenton H. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William C. Bailey, Jr.
Represented By: Zachary Benjamin Pyers
Represented By: Kenton H. Steele
Represented By: Thomas N. Spyker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?