Meijer, Inc. v. United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company et al
Plaintiff: Meijer, Inc.
Defendant: United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburgh, PA, Federal Insurance Company, The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company and American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00182
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Walter H Rice
Referring Judge: Peter B Silvain
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2021 Filing 42 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburgh, PA, AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc., AIG Property Casualty, Inc., American International Group, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate American International Group, Inc., Other Affiliate AIG Property Casualty, Inc., Other Affiliate AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc. for National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburgh, PA.. (Campbell, Drew)
August 25, 2021 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re #36 MOTION to Remand to the Montgomery County Court of Common Pleas filed by Defendant United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company. (Osterlund, Anthony)
August 23, 2021 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition re #33 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Plaintiff Meijer, Inc.. (Rice, Matthew)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER sustaining #39 Agreed MOTION to Stay (i) Extend Time for All Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and (ii) Hold The Preliminary Conference in Abeyance by Defendant United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company. Motion to transfer and motion to remand to be briefed according to Rule. Preliminary Pretrial Telephone Conference set for 8/23/2021 is cancelled. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 08/10/2021. (tp)
August 6, 2021 Filing 39 MOTION to Stay (Agreed Motion to (i) Extend Time for All Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and (ii) Hold The Preliminary Conference in Abeyance) by Defendant United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company. (Osterlund, Anthony)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTATION ORDER granting #35 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joseph M. Vanek as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 8/5/2021. (pb)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTATION ORDER granting #34 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Trevor K. Scheetz Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 8/5/2021. (pb)
August 4, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION to Remand to the Montgomery County Court of Common Pleas by Plaintiff Meijer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Meijer, Inc.'s Motion to Remand to the Montgomery County Court of Common Pleas) (Rice, Matthew)
August 3, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8434995) of Joseph M. Vanek by Plaintiff Meijer, Inc.. (Rice, Matthew)
August 3, 2021 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8434323) of Trevor K. Scheetz by Plaintiff Meijer, Inc.. (Rice, Matthew)
August 3, 2021 Reset Answer Deadline for All Defendants: due by 9/9/2021. (srb)
August 2, 2021 Filing 33 MOTION to Change Venue by Defendant United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Bryce L. Friedman) (Osterlund, Anthony)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER sustaining re #32 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #6 Complaint. Extension to 9/9/2021 for All Defendants. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 8/2/2021. (djv)
July 30, 2021 Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #6 Complaint New date requested 9/9/2021. for All Defendants by Defendant United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company. (Osterlund, Anthony)
July 27, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Jillian L. Dinehart for Defendant Federal Insurance Company (Dinehart, Jillian)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #30 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert A. Kole as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 07/27/2021. (jmb)
July 26, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8420190) of Robert A. Kole by Defendant The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Engling, Mark)
July 22, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $800 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8414661) of Michael Shuster, Robert Mangino, Blair Kaminsky and Daniel Sullivan by Defendant Federal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Michael Shuster, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Robert Mangino, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Blair Kaminsky, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Daniel Sullivan) (Fagnilli, David)
July 22, 2021 If case is referred it will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr. (jmb)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #29 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael Shuster, Robert Mangino, Blair Kaminsky and Daniel Sullivan as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel are directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 07/22/2021. (jmb)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #26 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christopher James St. Jeanos as Co-Counsel; granting #27 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of James E. Fitzmaurice as Co-Counsel; and granting #28 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joseph G. Davis as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel are directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 07/19/2021. (jmb)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER approving - re #21 STIPULATION of Extension of Time for All Defendants To Answer, Move, or Otherwise Plead by Defendant United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 07/19/2021. (tp)
July 16, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8406402) of Joseph G. Davis by Defendant National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburgh, PA. (Campbell, Drew)
July 16, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8406375) of James E. Fitzmaurice by Defendant National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburgh, PA. (Campbell, Drew)
July 16, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8406359) of Christopher J. St. Jeanos by Defendant National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburgh, PA. (Campbell, Drew)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Bryce L. Friedman; and granting #25 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joshua Polster as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 07/15/2021. (jmb)
July 14, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8402369) of Joshua Polster by Defendant United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Osterlund, Anthony)
July 14, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8402236) of Bryce L. Friedman by Defendant United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Osterlund, Anthony)
July 12, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8398612) of Michael Miron Marick by Defendant American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (Chudakoff, Robert)
July 12, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8398610) of Karen Marie Dixon by Defendant American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (Chudakoff, Robert)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael Miron Marick as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 07/12/2021. (jmb)
July 12, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company answer due 8/3/2021; Federal Insurance Company answer due 8/3/2021; National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburgh, PA answer due 8/3/2021; The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company answer due 8/3/2021; United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company answer due 8/3/2021. (jmb)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Karen Marie Dixon as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 07/12/2021. (jmb)
July 9, 2021 Filing 21 STIPULATION of Extension of Time for All Defendants To Answer, Move, or Otherwise Plead by Defendant United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company. (Osterlund, Anthony)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: This case is hereby transferred from the docket of the Honorable Matthew W. McFarland to the Office of the Clerk for reassignment to the Western Division of the Southern District of Ohio at Dayton. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 07/08/2021. (kaf)
July 8, 2021 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Meijer, Inc.. (Rice, Matthew)
July 8, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Huntley Rice for Plaintiff Meijer, Inc. (Rice, Matthew)
July 8, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE by Defendant United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company of Supplemental Exhibit to Complaint filed in State Court Montgomery County on 7/2/2021 in Case No. 2021-CV-02276. (Osterlund, Anthony)
July 8, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE by Defendant United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company of Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet (Osterlund, Anthony)
July 8, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE by Defendant United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company of Civil Cover Sheet (Osterlund, Anthony)
July 8, 2021 Case transferred in from Western Division Division on 07/08/2021. Case Number 1:21-cv-453. Case assigned to Judge Walter H. Rice. (kaf)
July 7, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE by Defendant National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburgh, PA re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent to Removal (Campbell, Drew)
July 7, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company, Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., Zurich Insurance Company Ltd., Zurich Insurance Group Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Zurich American Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Company Ltd., Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Group Ltd. for American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company.. (Chudakoff, Robert)
July 7, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, Ohio Casualty Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Ohio Casualty Corporation for The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company.. (Engling, Mark)
July 7, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE by Defendant The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Consent to Removal (Engling, Mark)
July 7, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Engling for Defendant The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company (Engling, Mark)
July 7, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Federal Insurance Company, Chubb INA Holdings, Inc., Chubb Group Holdings Inc., Chubb Limited identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings Inc. for Federal Insurance Company.. (Fagnilli, David)
July 7, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE by Defendant Federal Insurance Company of Consent to Removal (Fagnilli, David)
July 7, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David J Fagnilli for Defendant Federal Insurance Company (Fagnilli, David)
July 7, 2021 Filing 6 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment originally filed 6/7/2021 in Montgomery County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. 2021 CV 02276) by Meijer, Inc.. (kl)
July 7, 2021 Filing 5 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney Daniel M. Sullivan and Robert A. Kole. (kl) Filed document sent by e-mail to attorneys. (kl).
July 7, 2021 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (kl)
July 6, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Defendant American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent to Removal (Chudakoff, Robert)
July 6, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E Chudakoff for Defendant American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company (Chudakoff, Robert)
July 6, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company, St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Companies, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Companies, Inc. for United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company.. (Osterlund, Anthony)
July 6, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montgomery County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021-CV-02276 ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: BOHSDC-8390851), filed by United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Osterlund, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meijer, Inc. v. United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meijer, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Huntley Rice
Represented By: Joseph M Vanek
Represented By: Trevor K Scheetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company
Represented By: David Michael Edelstein
Represented By: Anthony L Osterlund
Represented By: Bryce L. Friedman
Represented By: Joshua Polster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburgh, PA
Represented By: Christopher J St. Jeanos
Represented By: Drew H Campbell
Represented By: James E. Fitzmaurice
Represented By: Joseph G. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: David J Fagnilli
Represented By: Blair Kaminsky
Represented By: Daniel Martin Sullivan
Represented By: Jillian L. Dinehart
Represented By: Michael S. Shuster
Represented By: Robert Mangino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark Engling
Represented By: Robert A. Kole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert E Chudakoff
Represented By: Karen Marie Dixon
Represented By: Michael M Marick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?