Gannon v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Jennifer Gannon
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2021cv00203
Filed: July 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael J Newman
Referring Judge: Sharon L Ovington
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Filing 5 First CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by Defendant Statement of Errors due by 11/8/2021. (Stark, John)
August 9, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Ameenah Lewis for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Lewis, Ameenah) Modified Attorney Role on 8/10/2021 (rp).
July 28, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Jennifer Gannon. (jmb)
July 28, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Commissioner of Social Security answer due 9/27/2021. (jmb)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #1 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 7-27-21. (zcc)
July 26, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jennifer Gannon. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 USDC Form) (Walter, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gannon v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Gannon
Represented By: Robert Christopher Walter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Represented By: Ameenah Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?