Bey et al v. Heck et al
Plaintiff: Luna LaToya Bey and Aladdin Moroc Bey
Defendant: Cynthia M. Heck, Timothy P. Corcoran, Andrew J. Bronsord, Michael Lang, Kyle Gee, Deanna Roe, Christopher Baker and Adam Reynolds
Case Number: 3:2021cv00211
Filed: August 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Ovington
Referring Judge: Walter H Rice
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 241
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Plaintiffs' submission in the present case remains deficient. Accordingly, to the extent that Plaintiffs' submission is intended to serve as Plaintiffs' applications to proceed in forma pauperis, such request is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to submit, within twenty-one (21) days, the required filing fee or alternatively, their respective applications for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiffs are advised that the Court will recommend dismissal of this case for want of prosecution should they fail to timely comply with this Order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send two copies of the in forma pauperis application to Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 9/23/2021. (bjr)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE entitled Affidavit of Fact - Writ of Error by Plaintiffs, Aladdin Moroc Bey, Luna LaToya Bey re Notice of Deficiency (Clerk's Notice). (bjr)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency re: Requires a filing fee or motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and service documents. Related Document: #1 Complaint, filed by Luna LaToya Bey, Aladdin Moroc Bey. Deficiency Deadline by 9/3/2021. (bjr)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Christopher Baker, Andrew J. Bronsord, Timothy P. Corcoran, Kyle Gee, Cynthia M. Heck, Michael Lang, Adam Reynolds, Deanna Roe, filed by Aladdin Moroc Bey, Luna LaToya Bey. (bjr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/3/2021: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Affidavit of Fact, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Cover Letter and Envelope) (pb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bey et al v. Heck et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luna LaToya Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aladdin Moroc Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia M. Heck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy P. Corcoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew J. Bronsord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Gee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deanna Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?