Dowell v. Warden
Petitioner: Anthony C Dowell
Respondent: Warden, London Correctional Institution
Case Number: 3:2021cv00271
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Merz
Referring Judge: Michael J Newman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2021 Filing 7 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Anthony C. Dowell. (er)
October 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Anne Reese for Respondent Warden, London Correctional Institution (Reese, Mary)
September 29, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Memorandum in Support of Request for #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Anthony C Dowell. (Attachments: #1 Transcript 3-19-2017, #2 Decision and Entry from Miami County 2/21/2018, #3 Decision and Entry from Miami County 4/15/2019, #4 State Supplemental Response 4/18/2019, #5 Entry Denying Defendant's Motion to Vacate 7/8/2019, #6 Opinion from Miami County 4/3/2020, #7 Final Entry from Miami County 4/3/2020, #8 Decision and Entry from Miami County entered 8/6/2020) (er)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR ANSWER - It is hereby ORDERED that Respondent shall, not later than December 1, 2021, file an answer conforming to the requirements of Rule 5 of the Rules Governing 2254 Cases. Petitioner may, not later than twenty-one days after filing of the answer, file and serve a reply to the answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 9/29/2021. (kpf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification. The Petition was also forwarded via e-mail to Attorney General of Ohio, Habeas Corpus Unit of the Corrections Litigation Section c/o Brian.Higgins@ohioattorneygeneral.gov and Habeas.docketclerk@ohioattorneygeneral.gov.
September 29, 2021 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Anthony C Dowell. (kpf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2021: #1 Attachments) (kpf).
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notation ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall detach the Petition and docket it separately. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 9/28/2021. (MRM)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The following document(s) were not submitted to the Office of the Clerk: Civil Cover Sheet) by Petitioner, Anthony C. Dowell. (Attachments: #1 Petition Under 28 U.S.C. 2254, Writ for Habeas Corpus #2 Attachments) (bjr) Modified on 9/28/2021 (bjr).
September 28, 2021 Notice of Deficiency re: Related Document: #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The following document(s) were not submitted to the Office of the Clerk: Civil Cover Sheet). Deficiency Deadline by 10/28/2021. (bjr)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dowell v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony C Dowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, London Correctional Institution
Represented By: Mary Anne Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?