Long v. Adcare Employee Leasing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Colleen Long
Defendant: Adcare Employee Leasing, LLC and UVMC Nursing Care, Inc. doing business as Koester Pavilion
Case Number: 3:2021cv00277
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Walter H Rice
Referring Judge: Peter B Silvain
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Adcare Employee Leasing, LLC, Regional Health Properties, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Regional Health Properties, Inc. for Adcare Employee Leasing, LLC.. (Bittner, Paul)
November 24, 2021 Filing 14 Defendant Adcare Employee Leasing, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand to Plaintiff Colleen Long's Complaint filed by Adcare Employee Leasing, LLC. (Bittner, Paul)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER approving #13 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant UVMC Nursing Care, Inc. dba Koester Pavilion, without Prejudice by Plaintiff Colleen Long. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 11/12/2021. (tp)
November 10, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant UVMC Nursing Care, Inc. dba Koester Pavilion, without Prejudice by Plaintiff Colleen Long. (DeRose, Robert)
November 1, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant UVMC Nursing Care, Inc.. UVMC Nursing Care, Inc. served on 10/12/2021, answer due 11/2/2021. (DeRose, Robert)
October 29, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extension of Time to Move or Plead by Defendant Adcare Employee Leasing, LLC. (Bittner, Paul)
October 28, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE by Plaintiff Colleen Long of Filing Consents to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Marlena Mead, #2 Exhibit Consent of Andrea Ward) (DeRose, Robert)
October 26, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE by Plaintiff Colleen Long of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Kelly Tedder) (DeRose, Robert)
October 18, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE by Plaintiff Colleen Long of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Crystal Pintos) (DeRose, Robert)
October 11, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Plaintiff Colleen Long of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Leona Stewart) (DeRose, Robert)
October 8, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by Plaintiff Colleen Long of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Angelo Gardner) (DeRose, Robert)
October 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Plaintiff Colleen Long of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Nelba Clark) (DeRose, Robert)
October 7, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Plaintiff Colleen Long of Filing Consents to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Sara Brickles, #2 Exhibit Consent of Jolene Crawford, #3 Exhibit Consent of Charlia Goodloe, #4 Exhibit Consent of Tresa McKinney, #5 Exhibit Consent of Allen Meehan, #6 Exhibit Consent of Christen Reedy-Butts, #7 Exhibit Consent of Charles Jordan, #8 Exhibit Consent of Quenton Sumlin, #9 Exhibit Consent of Susie Williams) (DeRose, Robert)
October 7, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Adcare Employee Leasing, LLC, UVMC Nursing Care, Inc.. (pb)
October 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Adcare Employee Leasing, LLC, UVMC Nursing Care, Inc., filed by Colleen Long. The receipt number is AOHSDC-8532442.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Summons Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (pb) Modified on 10/7/2021 (pb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Long v. Adcare Employee Leasing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Long
Represented By: Robert E DeRose, II
Represented By: Brian Richard Noethlich
Represented By: Samuel Micah Schlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adcare Employee Leasing, LLC
Represented By: Paul L Bittner
Represented By: Abigail J. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UVMC Nursing Care, Inc. doing business as Koester Pavilion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?