Southwood v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Timothy D. Southwood
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2021cv00278
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Walter H Rice
Referring Judge: Peter B Silvain
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Stark, John)
December 1, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Commissioner of Social Security answer due 12/27/2021. (jmb)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Peter B. Silvain, Jr. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 11/2/21. (pb)
October 29, 2021 Filing 4 JOINT CONSENT OF THE PARTIES TO PROCEED BEFORE THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE . (Sorkin, Adam)
October 26, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam R. Sorkin for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Sorkin, Adam)
October 8, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Commissioner of Social Security answer due 12/6/2021. (jmb)
October 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8533660), filed by Timothy D. Southwood. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rake, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southwood v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy D. Southwood
Represented By: Michael A Rake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Adam R. Sorkin
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?