Turner v. Cox Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Renea Turner
Defendant: Cox Enterprises, Inc. and Cox Media Group, Inc
Case Number: 3:2021cv00288
Filed: October 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Caroline H Gentry
Referring Judge: Sharon L Ovington
2 Judge: Walter H Rice
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #13 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response as to #9 Defendants' Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default and Response in Opposition to Motion for Default Judgment. Response due by 5/2/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline H. Gentry on 4-13-22. (zcc)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #12 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response as to #10 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Response due by 5/2/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline H. Gentry on 4-13-22. (zcc)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
April 13, 2022 Reset Deadline as to #9 MOTION to Set Aside Default And Response in Opposition to Motion for Default Judgment. Response due by 5/2/2022. (srb)
April 11, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE - Proof of Delivery of Summons and Complaint by Plaintiff, Renea Turner. (srb)
April 8, 2022 Filing 13 PLAINTIFF MOTION REQUESTING AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. New date requested 5/2/2022. by Plaintiff Renea Turner. (srb)
April 8, 2022 Filing 12 PLAINTIFF MOTION REQUESTING AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. New date requested 5/2/2022. by Plaintiff Renea Turner. (srb)
March 21, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF OF MOTION TO DISMISS - You are hereby notified that a Motion to Dismiss has been filed in this case. Defendants Cox Enterprises, Inc. and Cox Media Group, Inc. filed a Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #10 ) on March 15, 2022. You should receive a copy of the Motion directly from Defendants. Your response must be filed with the Court not later than April 8, 2022. If you fail to file a timely response, Defendants Motion to Dismiss may be granted and your case dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline H. Gentry on 3/21/2022. (srb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 15, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Cox Enterprises, Inc., Cox Media Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Greiner, John)
March 15, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Set Aside Default And Response in Opposition to Motion for Default Judgment by Defendants Cox Enterprises, Inc., Cox Media Group, Inc. (Greiner, John)
March 15, 2022 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Cox Enterprises, Inc., Cox Media Group, Inc. (Greiner, John)
February 22, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Default Judgment against Cox Media Group, Inc, and Cox Enterprises, Inc by Plaintiff Renea Turner. (pb)
February 16, 2022 Filing 6 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Cox Enterprises Inc, and Cox Media Group, Inc. (pb)
February 16, 2022 Filing 5 Application to Clerk for entry of default against Cox Enterprises, Inc, and Cox Media Group, Inc. by Renea Turner (pb)
February 15, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Cox Enterprises, Inc., Cox Media Group, Inc. Cox Enterprises, Inc. served on 11/15/2021, answer due 12/6/2021; Cox Media Group, Inc served on 11/12/2021, answer due 12/3/2021. (pb)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Caroline H. Gentry for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 2/8/22. (jcw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 20, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Cox Enterprises, Inc., Cox Media Group, Inc. (srb)
October 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND (Filing Fee of $400 Paid under receipt number 300DAY025457) against Cox Enterprises, Inc., Cox Media Group, Inc, filed by Renea Turner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Summons Form) (srb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Cox Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renea Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: John Charles Greiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox Media Group, Inc
Represented By: John Charles Greiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?