Tanyike v. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Plaintiff: Henry Tanyike
Defendant: USA and Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 3:2021cv00311
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
Referring Judge: Peter B Silvain
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret A Castro for Defendant Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Castro, Margaret)
December 27, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Attorney General, served on 12/16/2021. Answer due 2/14/2022. (bjr)
December 23, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant, Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Civil Process Clerk, U. S. Attorney's Office served on 12/7/2021, Answer due 2/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt Return Domestic Return Receipt) (Jong, Jeremy) Modified on 12/27/2021 (bjr).
December 1, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney General and U.S. Attorney. (srb) Modified on 12/1/2021 to reflect only two summons attached.(jmb).
December 1, 2021 Notice of Correction: Please note the Defendant's name has been corrected to reflect "Immigration and Customs Enforcement" in accordance with the Party Naming Standards available at http://www.ohsd.uscourts.gov. No further action is required. (jmb)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeremy Jong as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is direct to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 12/1/2021. (srb)
November 30, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Hoffman, Brian)
November 30, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Hoffman, Brian)
November 30, 2021 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8614346) of Jeremy Jong by Plaintiff Henry Tanyike. (Hoffman, Brian)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT UNDER FEDERAL TORT CLAIMS ACT against USA ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8596712), filed by Henry Tanyike. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hoffman, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tanyike v. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Tanyike
Represented By: Brian J Hoffman
Represented By: Jeremy Jong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Margaret A Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?