Owensby v. City of Dayton et al
Plaintiff: Clifford Owensby
Defendant: City of Dayton, Wayne M Hammock and Vincent J Carter
Case Number: 3:2021cv00343
Filed: December 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Caroline H Gentry
Referring Judge: Michael J Newman
2 Judge: Sharon L Ovington
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER: Telephone Conference re: Mediation set for 2/4/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain Jr. TELECONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS: Please call 888-363-4735. The access code is 6287286. The security code is 123456. If you have any questions, please call Chambers at 937-512-1620. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr. on 2/25/2022. (lk)
February 23, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by All Defendants. (text searchable version of original #10 ) (Laugle, Adam) Modified on 2/23/2022 to link text searchable document. (bjr)
February 22, 2022 Filing 11 Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance Local Rule 5.1 (c): The Clerk's Office has reviewed your filing, docket #10 Answer to Complaint filed by Wayne M Hammock, City of Dayton, Vincent J Carter and it appears that one or more of the PDFs are not text searchable and therefore is not in compliance with Local Rule 5.1 (c). You shall refile docket #10 Answer to Complaint filed by Wayne M Hammock, City of Dayton, Vincent J Carter as a text searchable document(s), linking the document back to the original entry within 24-hours. Non-Compliance Deadline due by 2/23/2022. (srb)
February 21, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by All Defendants. (Laugle, Adam)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Caroline H. Gentry for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 2/8/22. (jcw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Move or Plead filed by Defendants City of Dayton, Wayne Hammock and Vincent Carter. Defendants' answer due by 2/21/22. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 2-4-22. (zcc)
January 31, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 2/21/2022. by Defendants Vincent J Carter, City of Dayton, Wayne M Hammock. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Laugle, Adam)
January 18, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant, City of Dayton. City of Dayton served on 1/10/2022, Answer due 1/31/2022. (bjr)
January 11, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant, Wayne M Hammock. Wayne M Hammock served on 1/7/2022, Answer due 1/28/2022. (bjr)
January 5, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF MAILING BY CLERK - Certified mail service has been performed by the Clerk, U.S. District Court on January 5, 2021. A copy of the summons and complaint was sent by certified mail to the following locations: City of Dayton, c/o Law Department, 101 W. Third Street, Dayton, Ohio 45402, Article Tracking No. 7021 2720 0002 4871 1891; Wayne M. Hammock, Dayton Police Department, 335 W. Third Street, Dayton, Ohio 45402, Article Tracking No. 7021 2720 0002 4871 1877; and Vincent J. Carter, Dayton Police Department, 335 W. Third Street, Dayton, Ohio 45402, Article Tracking No. 7021 2720 0002 4871 1860. (bjr)
January 3, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to City of Dayton, Wayne M Hammock and Vincent J Carter. (srb)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: (1) REFERRING THIS CASE FOR MEDIATION ONLY; (2) ORDERING THE PARTIES TO APPEAR FOR MEDIATION BEFORE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE PETER B. SILVAIN, JR.; AND (3) DIRECTING THE PARTIES TO CONTACT HIS CHAMBERS TO SCHEDULE MEDIATION ONCE ALL PARTIES HAVE APPEARED AND BEEN SERVED. Signed by Judge Michael J. Newman on 12/31/2021. (srb)
December 29, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Willis, James)
December 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, filed by Clifford Owensby. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form Request for Summons City of Dayton, #3 Summons Form Request for Summons Carter, #4 Summons Form Request for Summons Hammock) (Willis, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owensby v. City of Dayton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Owensby
Represented By: James R Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Dayton
Represented By: Adam Martin Laugle
Represented By: Leonard J Bazelak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne M Hammock
Represented By: Adam Martin Laugle
Represented By: Leonard J Bazelak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent J Carter
Represented By: Leonard J Bazelak
Represented By: Adam Martin Laugle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?