Lawson v. Warden, Noble Correctional Institution
Plaintiff: Thomas W. Lawson
Defendant: Warden, Noble Correctional Institution
Case Number: 3:2022cv00040
Filed: February 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Michael J Newman
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTATION ORDER granting #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer/Return of Writ as to Warden, Noble Correctional Institution. Answer/Return of Writ due 5/12/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 4/8/2022. (EPD)
April 7, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 5/12/2022. Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Respondent Warden, Noble Correctional Institution. (Reese, Mary)
March 3, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Anne Reese for Respondent Warden, Noble Correctional Institution (Reese, Mary)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: It is ORDERED that Respondent shall file an answer conforming to the requirements of Rule 5 of the Rules Governing 2254 Cases within sixty (60) days of the date of filing of this Order. Petitioner may, not later than twenty-one (21) days after the answer is filed, file and serve a reply to the answer. The Clerk is ordered to serve the petition on respondent and the Attorney General of Ohio, Habeas Corpus Unit of the Corrections Litigation Section c/o Brian.Higgins@OhioAGO.gov and Habeas.docketclerk@OhioAGO.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 2/11/2022. (er)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 8, 2022 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 300DAY025802 (bjr)
February 8, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Thomas W. Lawson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawson v. Warden, Noble Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas W. Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden, Noble Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?