Lanfersiek v. O'Charleys, LLC
Plaintiff: Brandon Lanfersiek
Defendant: O'Charley's Restaurants and O'Charley's, LLC doing business as O'Charley's Restaurant and Bar
Case Number: 3:2022cv00131
Filed: May 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Caroline H Gentry
Referring Judge: Michael J Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2022 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Brandon Lanfersiek. (Carden, Brianna)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: (1) Granting the Parties' Joint Motion to Stay (Doc. No. #4 ); and (2) Ordering the Parties to Submit Status Reports Every Three Months. Signed by Judge Michael J. Newman on 05/25/2022. (jmb)
May 25, 2022 Filing 4 STIPULATION AND JOINT MOTION TO STAY by Defendant O'Charley's, LLC. (Day, Alison)
May 19, 2022 Filing 3 (Copy of) COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF with JURY DEMAND ENDORSED HEREIN against O'Charley's Restaurants, filed by Brandon Lanfersiek. Originally filed on 4/15/2022 in the Montgomery County Common Pleas Court, Case No. 2022CV01683. (bjr)
May 18, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants O'Charley's Restaurants, Cannae Newport Holdings, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cannae Newport Holdings, Inc. for O'Charley's Restaurants. (Day, Alison) Modified on 5/19/2022 to make document text-searchable. (bjr)
May 18, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montgomery County Common Pleas, case number 2022 CV 01683 ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8869144), filed by O'Charley's Restaurants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Day, Alison) Modified on 5/19/2022 to make documents text-searchable. (bjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lanfersiek v. O'Charleys, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Lanfersiek
Represented By: Evan R McFarland
Represented By: Brianna Renay Carden
Represented By: Matthew G Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Charley's Restaurants
Represented By: Alison M Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Charley's, LLC doing business as O'Charley's Restaurant and Bar
Represented By: Alison M Day
Represented By: Azure'D Kariyen Metoyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?