Napier v. American Economy Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Tony Napier
Defendant: American Economy Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2022cv00318
Filed: November 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael J Newman
Referring Judge: Peter B Silvain
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 1/31/2023. Motions directed to pleadings due by 1/31/2023. Motions to Amend due by 1/31/2023. Lay Witness due by 3/15/2023. Plaintiff Primary Expert due by 4/17/2023. Defendant Primary Expert due by 6/19/2023. Rebuttal Expert due by 7/19/2023. Discovery due by 8/21/2023. Dispositive motions due by 9/21/2023. Signed by Judge Michael J. Newman on 12/20/22. (pb)
December 15, 2022 Filing 7 RULE 26(f) REPORT - Re: (Doc. #5 ) of Parties by Plaintiff Tony Napier. (Lane, Donald) Modified on 12/15/2022 to create link to Document 5. (cib).
December 15, 2022 Filing 6 Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance Local Rule 5.1 (c): The Clerk's Office has reviewed your filing, docket #5 Rule 26(f) Report , and it appears that one or more of the PDFs are not text searchable and therefore is not in compliance with Local Rule 5.1 (c). You shall refile docket #5 as a text searchable document(s), linking the document back to the original entry within 24-hours. Non-Compliance Deadline due by 12/16/2022. (bjr)
December 12, 2022 Filing 5 RULE 26(f) REPORT of Parties by Plaintiff Tony Napier. (Lane, Donald)
November 15, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Complaint filed by American Economy Insurance Company. (Harter, William)
November 9, 2022 Filing 3 (Copy of) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against American Economy Insurance Company, filed by Tony Napier. Originally filed in Common Pleas Court of Montgomery County, Ohio Civil Division on October 6, 2022 under case number 2022CV04555) (srb)
November 8, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant American Economy Insurance Company. (Harter, William)
November 8, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montgomery County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2022 CV 04555 ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9131986), filed by American Economy Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - state court pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Harter, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Napier v. American Economy Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Napier
Represented By: Matthew Clay Smallwood
Represented By: Donald Alan Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Economy Insurance Company
Represented By: William M Harter
Represented By: Kaitlin L Madigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?