Liggins v. Evenflo Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Terrance Liggins
Defendant: Evenflo Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00353
Filed: November 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Caroline H Gentry
Referring Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2617 Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Adair Martin Smith for Defendant Evenflo Company, Inc. (Smith, Adair)
January 19, 2024 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Evenflo Company, Inc.. (Dunlevey, Karen)
December 28, 2023 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Evenflo Company, Inc. on 11/29/2023, answer due 1/29/2024. (Imm, Stephen)
November 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Evenflo Company, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9704254), filed by Terrance Liggins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Imm, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liggins v. Evenflo Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Liggins
Represented By: Stephen E Imm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evenflo Company, Inc.
Represented By: Adair Martin Smith
Represented By: Karen T Dunlevey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?