Smith v. Miami Valley Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Elaine R. Smith
Defendant: Miami Valley Hospital, Premier Health Partners, Miami Valley Emergency Specialists, LLC, Trent Davis, Steven F. Chapman, Titus Chu, Trevor Bickford, Joseph W. Inhofer, Megan M. Snyder, Steven F. Chapman, DO, Titus Chu, MD, Trevor Bickford, MD, Joseph W Inhofer, MD and Megan M Snyder, RN
Case Number: 3:2023cv00365
Filed: December 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael J Newman
Referring Judge: Peter B Silvain
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE by Defendant Steven F. Chapman, DO of Services of Fed.R. 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Lyon, Michael)
February 1, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE by Defendants Trevor Bickford, MD, Joseph W Inhofer, MD, Miami Valley Hospital, Premier Health Partners, Megan M Snyder, RN OF SERVICE OF INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Hardesty, Jaren)
January 22, 2024 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand of Defendants, Miami Valley Emergency Specialists, LLC and Steven F. Chapman, DO filed by Steven F. Chapman, DO. (Lyon, Michael)
January 22, 2024 Filing 11 Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance Local Rule 5.1 (c): The Clerk's Office has reviewed your filing, docket 8 Answer to Complaint, filed by Steven F. Chapman, DO., and it appears that one or more of the PDFs are not text searchable and therefore is not in compliance with Local Rule 5.1 (c). You shall refile docket 8 Answer to Complaint, filed by Steven F. Chapman, DO. as a text searchable document(s), linking the document back to the original entry within 24-hours. Non-Compliance Deadline due by 1/23/2024. (srb)
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: (1) REQUIRING THE PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER; (2) ORDERING THE PARTIES TO FILE THEIR FED. R. CIV. P. 26(f) REPORT ON OR BEFORE FEBRUARY 20, 2024; AND (3) ORDERING THE PARTIES TO MAKE INITIAL DISCLOSURES UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 26(a)(1) ON OR BEFORE FEBRUARY 13, 2024. Signed by Judge Michael J. Newman on 1/19/24. (pb)
January 18, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Francis Lyon for Defendant Steven F. Chapman, DO (Lyon, Michael)
January 16, 2024 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Titus Chu, MD. (DeBra, Joshua)
January 16, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Frederick DeBra for Defendant Titus Chu, MD (DeBra, Joshua)
January 9, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Amber Rose Mullaly for Defendants Trevor Bickford, MD, Joseph W Inhofer, MD, Miami Valley Hospital, Premier Health Partners, Megan M Snyder, RN (Mullaly, Amber)
January 9, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaren Allan Hardesty for Defendants Trevor Bickford, MD, Joseph W Inhofer, MD, Miami Valley Hospital, Premier Health Partners, Megan M Snyder, RN (Hardesty, Jaren)
January 9, 2024 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand also answer of Defendant Trent Davis filed by Trevor Bickford, MD, Joseph W Inhofer, MD, Miami Valley Hospital, Premier Health Partners, Megan M Snyder, RN. (Haviland, John)
December 8, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (srb)
December 7, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9719635), filed by Elaine R. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form to Defendant Miami Valley Hospital, #3 Summons Form to Defendant Premier Health Partners, #4 Summons Form to Defendant Miami Valley Emergency Specialists, LLC, #5 Summons Form to Defendant Trent Davis, #6 Summons Form to Defendant Steven F. Chapman, DO, #7 Summons Form to Defendant Titus Chu, MD, #8 Summons Form to Defendant Trevor Bickford, MD, #9 Summons Form to Defendant Joseph W. Inhofer, MD, #10 Summons Form to Defendant Megan M. Snyder, RN) (DiCello, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Miami Valley Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine R. Smith
Represented By: Nicholas A DiCello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami Valley Hospital
Represented By: John Francis Haviland
Represented By: Amber Rose Mullaly
Represented By: Jaren Allan Hardesty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Health Partners
Represented By: John Francis Haviland
Represented By: Amber Rose Mullaly
Represented By: Jaren Allan Hardesty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami Valley Emergency Specialists, LLC
Represented By: Michael Francis Lyon,
Represented By: Cullen P. Rooney
Represented By: Paul J Vollman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trent Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven F. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Titus Chu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevor Bickford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph W. Inhofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan M. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven F. Chapman, DO
Represented By: Michael Francis Lyon
Represented By: Cullen P. Rooney
Represented By: Paul J Vollman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Titus Chu, MD
Represented By: Joshua Frederick DeBra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevor Bickford, MD
Represented By: John Francis Haviland
Represented By: Amber Rose Mullaly
Represented By: Jaren Allan Hardesty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph W Inhofer, MD
Represented By: Amber Rose Mullaly
Represented By: Jaren Allan Hardesty
Represented By: John Francis Haviland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan M Snyder, RN
Represented By: John Francis Haviland
Represented By: Amber Rose Mullaly
Represented By: Jaren Allan Hardesty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?