U.S. Specialty Insurance Company v. Performance Site Development, LLC et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: PERFORMANCE SITE DEVELOPMENT, ) LLC, RODNEY R TRIMBACH, LISA TRIMBACH, Performance Site Development, LLC and Rodney R. Trimbach
Case Number: 3:2023cv00367
Filed: December 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Caroline H Gentry
Referring Judge: Michael J Newman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2024 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Performance Site Development, LLC on 1/18/2024, answer due 3/18/2024; Lisa Trimbach on 1/18/2024, answer due 3/18/2024; Rodney R. Trimbach on 1/18/2024, answer due 3/18/2024. (Hanna, Andrew)
December 15, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (Hanna, Andrew)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND ORDER - This matter is before the Court upon a sua sponte review for compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1(a)(2). Plaintiff U.S. Specialty Insurance Company has not filed a diversity disclosure statement as required by that Rule. Plaintiff is therefore ORDERED to file such a statement no later than fourteen days from the date of this Order. A sample Diversity of Citizenship Disclosure Statement is available on the Court's website. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline H. Gentry on 12/12/23. (pb)
December 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PERFORMANCE SITE DEVELOPMENT, ) LLC, LISA TRIMBACH, RODNEY R TRIMBACH ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9722621), filed by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 A. Civil Cover Sheet) (Frank, Ian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Specialty Insurance Company v. Performance Site Development, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Ian H Frank
Represented By: Andrew M. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERFORMANCE SITE DEVELOPMENT, ) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RODNEY R TRIMBACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISA TRIMBACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Performance Site Development, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney R. Trimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?