Brown et al v. Greene County Vocational School District Board of Education
Plaintiff: Joy Brown, J. B. and Jacob Brown
Defendant: Greene County Vocational School, Superintendent David Deskins, Maurice Harden, Greene County Vocational School District Board of Education and David Deskins
Case Number: 3:2024cv00014
Filed: January 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Caroline H Gentry
Referring Judge: Michael J Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 0794 Job Discrimination (Handicap)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Maurice Harden on 1/30/2024, answer due 4/1/2024. (Coe, Stefanie)
February 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING, IN PART, PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Doc. No. #23 ). Signed by Judge Michael J. Newman on 2/14/24. (pb)
February 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Engling for Defendant Maurice Harden (Engling, Mark)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 BRIEF by Defendants David Deskins, Greene County Vocational School District Board of Education. (Conover, Brodi)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Post-Trial Brief by Plaintiffs J. B., Jacob Brown, Joy Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Carwile, Tiffany)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 BRIEF by Defendant Maurice Harden. (Mahoney, Bryan)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Ann Hesse for Defendant Maurice Harden (Hesse, Lisa)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to David Deskins on 2/8/2024, answer due 4/8/2024. (Coe, Stefanie)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Greene County Vocational School District Board of Education on 2/8/2024, answer due 4/8/2024. (Coe, Stefanie)
February 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Transcript of Proceedings held on February 7, 2024, before Judge Michael J. Newman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Julie Hohenstein, RPR, CRR, RMR, Telephone number 937-512-1639. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office.. Redaction Request due 3/1/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/11/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2024. (jrh)
February 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: (1) REQUIRING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION MOTION ON THE DOCKET BY MONDAY, FEBRUARY 12, 2024; (2) REQUIRING PLAINTIFFS TO COMPLY WITH FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 4 AND SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF OHIO CIVIL RULE 65.1(b); (3) REQUIRING THE PARTIES TO FILE BRIEFS BY MONDAY, FEBRUARY 12, 2024 AS SET FORTH BELOW; (4) REQUIRING THE PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER ABOUT EXHIBITS BY MONDAY, FEBRUARY 12, 2024; AND (5) REQUIRING THE PARTIES TO NOTIFY THE COURT REPORTER ABOUT WHETHER THE TRANSCRIPT SHOULD BE SEALED BY FRIDAY, FEBRUARY 9, 2024 AT 9 A.M. Signed by Judge Michael J. Newman on 2/8/24. (pb)
February 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE by Plaintiffs J. B., Jacob Brown, Joy Brown Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons (Coe, Stefanie)
February 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE by Plaintiffs J. B., Jacob Brown, Joy Brown Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons (Coe, Stefanie)
February 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: (1) REQUIRING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION MOTION ON THE DOCKET BY MONDAY, FEBRUARY 12, 2024; (2) REQUIRING PLAINTIFFS TO COMPLY WITH FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 4 AND SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF OHIO CIVIL RULE 65.1(b); (3) REQUIRING THE PARTIES TO FILE BRIEFS BY MONDAY, FEBRUARY 12, 2024 AS SET FORTH BELOW; (4) REQUIRING THE PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER ABOUT EXHIBITS BY MONDAY, FEBRUARY 12, 2024; AND (5) REQUIRING THE PARTIES TO NOTIFY THE COURT REPORTER ABOUT WHETHER THE TRANSCRIPT SHOULD BE SEALED BY FRIDAY, FEBRUARY 9, 2024 AT 9 A.M. Signed by Judge Michael J. Newman on 02/08/2024. (jmb)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael J. Newman: Preliminary Injunction held on 2/7/2024. Attorneys Daniel Matusicky, Tiffany Carwile, and Stefanie Coe appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Attorneys Erin Butcher, Molly Vance, and Nicole Donovsky appeared on behalf of Defendant, Greene County Vocational School District Board of Education. Attorney Bryan Mahoney appeared on behalf of Defendant Maurice Harden. The Court heard from Counsel for all parties. The Court heard testimony from 8 sworn witnesses. Exhibits were entered. An Order will issue by separate entry. (Court Reporter: Julie Renee Hohenstein) (cem)
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER CLARIFYING THE SCHEDULE FOR THE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING ON WEDNESDAY, FEBRUARY 7, 2024 AT 9:30 A.M. Signed by Judge Michael J. Newman on 2/6/24. (pb)
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Elizabeth Butcher for Defendants David Deskins, Greene County Vocational School District Board of Education (Butcher, Erin)
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: (1) EXTENDING THE PREVIOUSLY ISSUED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER TO FEBRUARY 15, 2024 AT 12:00 A.M.; (2) CANCELING THE TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR TODAY, FEBRUARY 5, 2024 AT 4:45 P.M.; AND (3) SETTING A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING ON WEDNESDAY, FEBRUARY 7, 2024 AT 9:30 A.M. Signed by Judge Michael J. Newman on 2/5/2024. (srb)
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 2/5/2024 at 8:00 AM by Teleconference before Judge Michael J. Newman. Counsel shall call: 1-888-278-0296, enter access code 2725365, security code 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. (cem)
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael J. Newman: Status Conference held on 2/2/2024. Attorneys Tiffany Carwile, Stefanie Coe, and Daniel Matusicky appeared and participated on Plaintiffs' behalf. Attorneys Brodi Conover and Molly Vance appeared and participated on behalf of Defendant Greene County Vocational School District Board of Education and Defendant David Deskins. Attorney Bryan Mahoney appeared and participated on behalf of Defendant Maurice Hardin. The Court and Counsel discussed extending the TRO the full 28 days and scheduling a Preliminary Injunction hearing. The Court proposed a tentative Preliminary Injunction hearing date for 2/7/2024. The Court directed parties to meet and confer over the weekend and update the Court at the next status conference. The status conference is set for 2/5/2024 at 8:00 a.m. (Court Reporter: Julie Renee Hohenstein) (cem)
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 2/2/2024 at 5:00 PM by Teleconference before Judge Michael J. Newman. Counsel shall call: 1-888-278-0296, enter access code 2725365, security code 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. (cem)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF MEDIATION (dkc)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order NOTICE: Telephone Conference set for 1/31/2024 at 4:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Caroline H. Gentry. Please call 1-888-684-8852 and enter access code 1628120. (dkc)
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Joseph Mahoney for Defendant Maurice Harden (Mahoney, Bryan)
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael J. Newman: Telephone Conference held on 1/30/2024. Attorneys Tiffany Carwile, Stefanie Coe, and Daneil Matusicky appeared and participated on Plaintiffs' behalf. Attorneys Brodi Conover, Nicole Donovsky, and Molly Vance appeared and participated on behalf of Defendant Greene County Vocational School District Board of Education and Defendant David Deskins. Attorneys Bryan Mahoney and Mark Engling appeared and participated on behalf of Defendant Maurice Hardin. Court and counsel discussed extending the TRO as permitted under Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(2). Given the absence of objection by counsel, the Court will refer this case to Magistrate Judge Caroline H. Gentry for discussions regarding mediation and necessary discovery (if any). The Court will issue a separate Order extending the Temporary Restraining Order until midnight on Monday, 2/5/24. (Court Reporter: Julie Renee Hohenstein) (mcm)
January 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly G Vance for Defendants David Deskins, Greene County Vocational School District Board of Education (Vance, Molly)
January 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/30/2024 at 4:30 PM by Teleconference before Judge Michael J. Newman. Counsel shall call: 1-888-278-0296, enter access code 2725365, security code 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. (cem)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole M Donovsky for Defendants David Deskins, Greene County Vocational School (Donovsky, Nicole)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brodi J. Conover for Defendants David Deskins, Greene County Vocational School (Conover, Brodi)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: (1) granting #3 Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; and (2) Issuing a Temporary Restraining Order as Set Forth Herein, Effective for 14 Days Beginning on January 18, 2024 at 12:00 A.M. Signed by Judge Michael J. Newman on 1/17/24. (mcm)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Matusicky for Plaintiffs J. B., Jacob Brown, Joy Brown (Matusicky, Daniel)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs J. B., Joy Brown. (Coe, Stefanie)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany L. Carwile for Plaintiffs J. B., Joy Brown (Carwile, Tiffany)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against David Deskins, Greene County Vocational School, Maurice Harden ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9768882), filed by Joy Brown, J. B.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Coe, Stefanie)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order NOTICE: Telephone Conference set for 1/17/2024 at 12:15 PM by Teleconference before Judge Michael J. Newman. Counsel shall call: 1-888-278-0296, enter access code 2725365, security code 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. (cem)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/17/2024 at 4:00 PM by Teleconference before Judge Michael J. Newman. Counsel shall call: 1-888-278-0296, enter access code 2725365, security code 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. (cem)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael J. Newman: Telephone Conference held on 1/17/2024. The Court heard from Counsel for both sides. An Order will issue by separate entry. (Court Reporter: Julie Renee Hohenstein) (cem)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael J. Newman: Telephone Conference held on 1/17/2024. Counsel for both sides informed the Court of the current case status. A follow-up status conference is set for 4:00 PM 1/17/2024. (Court Reporter: Julie Renee Hohenstein) (cem)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. Greene County Vocational School District Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy Brown
Represented By: Stefanie Lynn Coe
Represented By: Daniel J. Matusicky
Represented By: Tiffany L. Carwile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. B.
Represented By: Tiffany L. Carwile
Represented By: Stefanie Lynn Coe
Represented By: Daniel J. Matusicky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Brown
Represented By: Daniel J. Matusicky
Represented By: Stefanie Lynn Coe
Represented By: Tiffany L. Carwile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene County Vocational School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superintendent David Deskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurice Harden
Represented By: Bryan Joseph Mahoney
Represented By: Mark Engling
Represented By: Lisa Ann Hesse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene County Vocational School District Board of Education
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Butcher
Represented By: Molly G Vance
Represented By: Brodi J. Conover
Represented By: Nicole M Donovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Deskins
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Butcher
Represented By: Nicole M Donovsky
Represented By: Brodi J. Conover
Represented By: Molly G Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?