Bertsch v. Auto Owners Insurance Co.
Plaintiff: Joyce Bertsch
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2024cv00019
Filed: January 23, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
Referring Judge: Peter B Silvain
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2024 Filing 13 RULE 26(f) REPORT filed by Plaintiff Joyce Bertsch. (Hutchins, Johanna)
February 21, 2024 Filing 12 Rule 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Terbrack, Robert)
February 21, 2024 Filing 11 ANSWER to #10 Complaint with Jury Demand (Second Amended Complaint) filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Terbrack, Robert)
January 29, 2024 Filing 10 (Copy of) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Originally filed in the Court of Common Pleas Court of Shelby County, Ohio, under case number 2023 CV 000218 filed on 11/20/2023). (srb)
January 26, 2024 Filing 9 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Joyce Bertsch. Second Amended Complaint With Jury Demand Endorsed Hereon. (Hutchins, Johanna)
January 26, 2024 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct the Pleadings by Plaintiff Joyce Bertsch. (Hutchins, Johanna)
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion to Amend the Pleadings. Plaintiff shall file her amended complaint on or before Tuesday, January 30, 2024. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 1/26/2024. (csm)
January 24, 2024 Filing 7 Rule 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Joyce Bertsch. (Hutchins, Johanna)
January 24, 2024 Filing 6 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Joyce Bertsch. First Amended Complaint With Jury Demand Endorsed Hereon. (Hutchins, Johanna)
January 24, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Johanna Beth Hutchins for Plaintiff Joyce Bertsch (Hutchins, Johanna)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND ORDER - This matter is before the Court upon a sua sponte review for compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1(a)(2). Defendant has not filed a diversity disclosure statement as required by that Rule. Defendant is therefore ORDERED to file such a statement no later than thirty days from the date of this Order. A sample Diversity of Citizenship Disclosure Statement is available on the Courts website. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr on 1/24/24. (pb)
January 24, 2024 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - AO Policy) (Terbrack, Robert)
January 23, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Terbrack, Robert)
January 23, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Shelby County Court of Common Pleas, case number 23CV000218 ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9779062), filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Terbrack, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bertsch v. Auto Owners Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Bertsch
Represented By: Johanna Beth Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert R. Terbrack, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?