Channels v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Angela Channels
Defendant: Martin O'Malley, Commissioner of the Social Security Administration and Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 3:2024cv00072
Filed: March 8, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2024 Filing 8 First CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by Defendant Statement of Errors due by 6/17/2024. (Attachments: #1 002 Court Transcript Index, #2 003 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, #3 004 Payment Documents and Decisions, #4 005 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, #5 006 Non Disability Related Development, #6 007 Disability Related Development, #7 008 Medical Records Part 1, #8 009 Medical Records Part 2, #9 010 Medical Records Part 3) (Stark, John)
April 11, 2024 CLERK'S NOTICE: As no party has indicated on the previously issued #5 Statement as to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form that they are withholding their consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction, the case will remain with the assigned Magistrate Judge for all matters, including entry of a final judgment pursuant to General Order 22-04. (jmb)
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. In accordance with the Southern District of Ohio Civil Rule 8.1, the Commissioner shall file and serve a certified copy of the administrative record within sixty (60) days after filing of the Social Security Identification Form, which copy shall function as the Answer. Plaintiff must file a Statement of Errors within forty-five (45) days after filing of the administrative record setting forth the bases upon which reversal or remand is sought. The Commissioner must file and serve a Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Statement of Errors within forty-five (45) days after service of the Statement of Errors. Plaintiff's Reply, if any, must be filed fifteen (15) days after the memorandum in opposition is filed. All briefing must include references to the administrative record. All documents filed electronically must be filed in optical character recognition (OCR) text-searchable PDF format. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 03/22/2024. (jmb)
March 22, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Angela Channels. (Dunn, Jennifer)
March 11, 2024 Filing 5 Statement As To Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form. The completed Statement As To Magistrate Jurisdiction Form shall be completed and emailed to the Court's Social Security Case Coordinator at, SSA_Coordinator@ohsd.uscourts.gov or mailed to: Office of the ClerkWalter H. Rice Federal Buildingand U.S. CourthouseRoom 712Attn: Social Security Coordinator200 W. Second StreetDayton, Ohio 45402DO NOT ELECTRONICALLY FILE THIS DOCUMENT, IT MUST BE MAILED TO THE ABOVE ADDRESS OR EMAILED TO SSA_Coordinator@ohsd.uscourts.gov. The completed Statement As To Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form due by 4/10/2024 (jmb)
March 11, 2024 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE and GENERAL ORDER 22-04: Pursuant to #S.D. Ohio General Order 22-04, if no party indicates that they are withholding their consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction, the case will remain with the assigned Magistrate Judge for all matters, including entry of a final judgment. Further, the filing of a party's statement of errors or memorandum in opposition without first filing an executed copy of the Statement as to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form will also be deemed as consent by that party to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction over all aspects of the litigation, including entry of a final judgment. (jmb)
March 11, 2024 Notice of Correction: Please note the defendant's name has been corrected to reflect Commissioner of Social Security in accordance with the Party Naming Standards available at #http://www.ohsd.uscourts.gov. No further action is required. (jmb)
March 11, 2024 Notice of Deficiency re: Requires a filing fee or motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Electronic filers can pay the fee #online. Please scroll down to the event called, Pay Fees Via Pay.gov to pay the required fee. Related Document: #1 Complaint filed by Angela Channels. Deficiency Deadline by 4/10/2024. (jmb)
March 11, 2024 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jennifer Dunn as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 03/11/2024. (jmb)
March 8, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9858182) of Jennifer L. Dunn by Plaintiff Angela Channels. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sobel, Sean)
March 8, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Martin O'Malley, Commissioner of the Social Security Administration, filed by Angela Channels. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Notice of Appeals Council Action) (Sobel, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Channels v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Channels
Represented By: Sean H Sobel
Represented By: Jennifer Latstetter Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin O'Malley, Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?